Jones v. Howard R. Young Correction Institution et al
Plaintiff: LUCIUS JONES
Defendant: CONNECTION HEALTH SERVICES, THE HOWARD R. YOUNG CORRECTION INSTITUTION, THE STATE OF DELAWARE DEPT OF CORRECTION, Howard R. Young Correction Institution and State of Delaware Dept of Correction
Case Number: 1:2019cv01354
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Lucius Jones. (Refused) (lak)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 Letter to Lucius Jones, dated 8/27/2019 from Clerk of Court regarding Trust Fund Account Statement and case status - re D.I. #9 Letter. (myr)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 Letter to Clerk of Court from Lucius Jones regarding Trust Fund Account Statement. (myr)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Plaintiff has no assets and no means to pay the initial partial filing fee. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form) Notice of Compliance deadline set for 9/25/2019. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/26/2019. (lak)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 Trust Fund Account Statement - filed by Lucius Jones. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (amf)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. Plaintiff shall submit certified copy of Trust Fund Account Statement showing all deposits, expenditures and balances during the six-month period, immediately preceding the filing of the complaint, obtained from the appropriate official at the institution at which the plaintiff is confined. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form) Notice of Compliance deadline set for 9/3/2019. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 08/01/2019. (mal)
July 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Record of case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 2:19-cv-03097. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER THIS CASE FORTHWITH TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE. THE MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS SHALL BE LEFT TO THE DISCRETION OF THE TRANSFEREE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/18/19. 7/19/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (jpd ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CONNECTION HEALTH SERVICES, THE HOWARD R. YOUNG CORRECTION INSTITUTION, THE STATE OF DELAWARE DEPT OF CORRECTION, filed by LUCIUS JONES. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by LUCIUS JONES..(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Howard R. Young Correction Institution et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNECTION HEALTH SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HOWARD R. YOUNG CORRECTION INSTITUTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE STATE OF DELAWARE DEPT OF CORRECTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard R. Young Correction Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Delaware Dept of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCIUS JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?