Rosenblatt v. WageWorks, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jordan Rosenblatt
Defendant: Jerome D. Gramaglia, Stuart C. Harvey, Jr., Robert L. Metzger, George P. Scanlon, WageWorks, Inc., Carol A. Goode, Bruce G. Bodaken, Thomas A. Bevilacqua and Edgar Montes
Case Number: 1:2019cv01416
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jordan Rosenblatt: For Thomas A. Bevilacqua waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Long, Brian)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jordan Rosenblatt: For Bruce G. Bodaken waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Long, Brian)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jordan Rosenblatt: For Carol A. Goode waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Long, Brian)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jordan Rosenblatt: For Jerome D. Gramaglia waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Long, Brian)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jordan Rosenblatt: For Stuart C. Harvey, Jr waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Long, Brian)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jordan Rosenblatt: For Robert L. Metzger waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Long, Brian)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jordan Rosenblatt: For George P. Scanlon waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Long, Brian)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jordan Rosenblatt: For Edgar Montes waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Long, Brian)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jordan Rosenblatt: For WageWorks, Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Long, Brian)
August 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
July 31, 2019 No Summons Issued. (lak)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT - filed with Jury Demand against Thomas A. Bevilacqua, Bruce G. Bodaken, Carol A. Goode, Jerome D. Gramaglia, Stuart C. Harvey, Jr, Robert L. Metzger, Edgar Montes, George P. Scanlon, WageWorks, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2697314.) - filed by Jordan Rosenblatt. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosenblatt v. WageWorks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome D. Gramaglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart C. Harvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George P. Scanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WageWorks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol A. Goode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce G. Bodaken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. Bevilacqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Montes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Rosenblatt
Represented By: Gina M. Serra
Represented By: Brian D. Long
Represented By: Seth D. Rigrodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?