Gordon v. Applewhite
Plaintiff: Stefon Gordon
Defendant: Donnette Applewhite
Case Number: 1:2019cv01428
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:11601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stefon Gordon. Donnette Applewhite served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (nmg)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 MOTION to Appoint Process Server U.S. Marshals Service. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/18/2019. (nmf)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Process Server U.S. Marshals Service - filed by Stefon Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Notice of Motion)(Bounds, Curtis)
August 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
July 31, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Donnette Applewhite on 7/31/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (mal)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 EXPEDITED COMPLAINT - filed against Donnette Applewhite - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2698239.) -filed by Stefon Gordon.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. Applewhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefon Gordon
Represented By: Kara M. Swasey
Represented By: Curtis Preston Bounds
Represented By: Megan Ann McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnette Applewhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?