Bayer Intellectual Property GMBH et al v. Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Bayer Intellectual Property GMBH, Bayer AG and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant: HEC Pharm USA Inc. and Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01448
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Timothy Belcher Dyk
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bayer Intellectual Property GMBH, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer AG. Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd. served on 8/12/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bayer Intellectual Property GMBH, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer AG. HEC Pharm USA Inc. served on 8/12/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy Belcher Dyk of the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. Please include the initials of the Judge (TBD) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
August 1, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to HEC Pharm USA Inc. on 8/1/2019; Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd. on 8/1/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (lak)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer Intellectual Property GMBH filed by Bayer AG, Bayer Intellectual Property GMBH. (lak)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,539,218 B2. (lak)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 6/26/2019. Date of Expiration of Patent: 2/17/2034.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 12/26/2021. (lak)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed against HEC Pharm USA Inc., Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2699554.) - filed by Bayer AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayer Intellectual Property GMBH et al v. Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEC Pharm USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayer Intellectual Property GMBH
Represented By: Derek James Fahnestock
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayer AG
Represented By: Derek James Fahnestock
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Derek James Fahnestock
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?