Robinson v. World Acceptance Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Robinson
Defendant: World Acceptance Corp. and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01476
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services, LLC Only by Joseph Robinson (Garibian, Antranig)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to October 3, 2019 filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 10/3/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/3/2019. (fms)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to October 3, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Robinson. World Acceptance Corp. served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Robinson. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
August 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
August 7, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Equifax Information Services, LLC and World Acceptance Corp. on 8/7/2019. (*Summons mailed to counsel's Philadelphia office) (amf)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC and World Acceptance Corp. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2703555) - filed by Joseph Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. World Acceptance Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Acceptance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Robinson
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?