Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., et al. v. Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Limited
Case Number: 1:2019cv01501
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Case associated with lead case: Create association to 1:18-cv-01689-CFC-SRF. ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 18-1689-CFC ONLY. (nmf)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SO ORDERED, re (83 in 1:18-cv-01689-CFC-SRF, 9 in 1:19-cv-01499-CFC, 8 in 1:19-cv-01498-CFC, 8 in 1:19-cv-01494-CFC, 7 in 1:19-cv-01492-CFC, 8 in 1:19-cv-01495-CFC, 8 in 1:19-cv-01501-CFC, 8 in 1:19-cv-01596-CFC, 9 in 1:19-cv-01500-CFC, 9 in 1:19-cv-01493-CFC, 8 in 1:19-cv-01594-CFC, 8 in 1:19-cv-01497-CFC, 7 in 1:19-cv-01496-CFC) STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Consolidation. ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 18-1689-CFC. Plaintiffs and Defendants shall follow the Scheduling Order entered in the Consolidated Action except for those deadlines outlined in this order. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/9/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01689-CFC-SRF et al.(nmf)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Cadila Healthcare Ltd. for Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Phillips, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Cadila Healthcare Limited. (Phillips, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Cadila Healthcare Limited.(Phillips, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Consolidation by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Phillips, John)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation. Cadila Healthcare Limited served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Dellinger, Megan)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation. Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Dellinger, Megan)
August 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01492-CFC et al.(nmg)
August 12, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Cadila Healthcare Limited on 8/12/2019; Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. on 8/12/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (kmd)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent C. H. Boehringer Sohn AG & Co. KG for Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (kmd)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,258,637 B2. (kmd)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: May 10, 2019. Date of Expiration of Patent: April 3, 2034.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 2/1/2022. (kmd)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2705832.) - filed by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., et al. v. Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadila Healthcare Limited
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?