Gress et al v. Aselage et al
Plaintiff: Kyle McNeil and Matthew Gress
Defendant: Hubert Birner, Jason Amello, Luc Marengere, Harry Palmin, Michelle Griffin, John M. Dunn, Steve Aselage and Chris Schelling
Nominal Defendant: Acer Therapeutics Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01505
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas J. McKenna filed by Matthew Gress, Kyle McNeil. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/3/2019. (dlw)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas J. McKenna - filed by Matthew Gress, Kyle McNeil. (Ernst, Ryan)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER DENYING #3 Stipulation - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Stipulation is DENIED AS PREMATURE. Once the "anticipated" events in the Securities Litigation occur, Plaintiffs may re-file their stipulation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, should the stipulation be re-filed, Plaintiff shall attach stipulations with similar terms which have been granted by a Court. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/9/2019. (dlw)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION to Stay Derivative Action by Matthew Gress, Kyle McNeil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ernst, Ryan)
August 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
August 12, 2019 No Summons Issued. (amf)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Jason Amello, Steve Aselage, Hubert Birner, John M. Dunn, Michelle Griffin, Luc Marengere, Harry Palmin, and Chris Schelling - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2706293) - filed by Kyle McNeil and Matthew Gress. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Plaintiff Gress, #2 Verification of Plaintiff McNeil, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gress et al v. Aselage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubert Birner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Amello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luc Marengere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Palmin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Aselage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Schelling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle McNeil
Represented By: Ryan M. Ernst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Gress
Represented By: Ryan M. Ernst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Acer Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?