Steven Madden, Ltd. v. Rothys, Inc.
Plaintiff: Steven Madden, Ltd.
Defendant: Rothys, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01509
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. for Steven Madden, Ltd. filed by Steven Madden, Ltd.. (Farnan, Brian)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Steven Madden, Ltd.. (Farnan, Brian)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rothys, Inc.- filed by Steven Madden, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Farnan, Brian)
August 15, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney William C. Carmody for Steven Madden, Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
August 15, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Rakim H.D. Brooks for Steven Madden, Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
August 15, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Stephen L Shackelford, Jr for Steven Madden, Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William C. Carmody, Stephen Shackelford, Jr., and Rakim H.D. Brooks filed by Steven Madden, Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/14/19. (ntl)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Steven Madden, Ltd.: For Rothys, Inc. waiver sent on 8/14/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Farnan, Brian)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William C. Carmody, Stephen Shackelford, Jr., sand Rakim H.D. Brooks - filed by Steven Madden, Ltd.. (Farnan, Brian)
August 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
August 12, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Rothys, Inc. on 8/13/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (kmd)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US D768,366 S; US D804,156 S; US D831,325 S; US D833,729 S; US D836,314 S; US D831,313 S; US D844,313 S. (kmd)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Rothys, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2706690.) - filed by Steven Madden, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven Madden, Ltd. v. Rothys, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rothys, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Madden, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: William C. Carmody
Represented By: Rakim H.D. Brooks
Represented By: Stephen L Shackelford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?