Duffy v. State Of Delaware
Petitioner: Charles E. Duffy
Respondent: State Of Delaware
Case Number: 1:2019cv01512
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER notifying petitioner that AEDPA applies to petition and petitioner must file attached election form with the court. (Copy to pet. with Mag. Consent Form & AEDPA Form). Notice of Compliance deadline set for 10/30/2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/9/2019. (lak)
August 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
August 13, 2019 Filing fee paid: $ 5, receipt number DEX032222. (amf)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Charles E. Duffy. (sam)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support re D.I. #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Charles E. Duffy. (sam)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (No IFP, No Fee Paid) - filed by Charles E. Duffy.(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duffy v. State Of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State Of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles E. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?