National Fire & Marine Insurance Company v. PACCAR Inc.
Plaintiff: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Defendant: PACCAR Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01517
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by PACCAR Inc.. (Baldwin, David)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION re #7 Opening Brief in Support of Lara D. Cassidy by PACCAR Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-9)(Baldwin, David)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION re #7 Opening Brief in Support of Douglas S. Grandstaff by PACCAR Inc.. (Baldwin, David)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter filed by PACCAR Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/18/2019. (Baldwin, David)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by PACCAR Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baldwin, David)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to October 4, 2019 filed by PACCAR Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/28/19. (ntl)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to October 4, 2019 - filed by PACCAR Inc.. (Baldwin, David)
August 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. PACCAR Inc. served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Katzenstein, Robert)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for National Fire & Marine Insurance Company filed by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Katzenstein, Robert)
August 13, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to PACCAR Inc. on 8/13/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT - filed with Jury Demand against PACCAR Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2707513.) - filed by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company v. PACCAR Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR Inc.
Represented By: David J. Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Robert J. Katzenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?