Simpler et al v. HSBC North American Holdings Inc.
Plaintiff: David C. Delpercio, Hank Smith and Amy L. Simpler
Defendant: HSBC North American Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01519
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION Governing Briefing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/07/2019. (etg)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Governing Briefing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #6 MOTION to Remand [Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction] by HSBC North American Holdings Inc.. (Hendershot, Sabrina)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by HSBC North American Holdings Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hendershot, Sabrina)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by HSBC North American Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendershot, Sabrina)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand [Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction] - filed by David C. Delpercio, Amy L. Simpler, Hank Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Anthony, David)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nancy G. Ross, Megan S. Webster, and Samuel P. Myler filed by HSBC North American Holdings Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/28/19. (ntl)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nancy G. Ross, Megan S. Webster, and Samuel P. Myler - filed by HSBC North American Holdings Inc.. (Hendershot, Sabrina)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to September 20, 2019 filed by HSBC North American Holdings Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/27/19. (ntl)
August 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to September 20, 2019 - filed by HSBC North American Holdings Inc.. (Hendershot, Sabrina)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings plc for HSBC North American Holdings Inc. filed by HSBC North American Holdings Inc.. (Hendershot, Sabrina)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Delaware Superior Court, Case Number N19C-06-027-VLM (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2707734)- filed by HSBC North American Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpler et al v. HSBC North American Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Delpercio
Represented By: David B. Anthony
Represented By: Brian Michael Gottesman
Represented By: Peter C. McGivney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hank Smith
Represented By: David B. Anthony
Represented By: Brian Michael Gottesman
Represented By: Peter C. McGivney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy L. Simpler
Represented By: David B. Anthony
Represented By: Brian Michael Gottesman
Represented By: Peter C. McGivney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC North American Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Sabrina M. Hendershot
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Represented By: Ryan D. Stottmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?