Dropbox, Inc. v. Motion Offense, LLC
Plaintiff: Dropbox, Inc.
Defendant: Motion Offense, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01521
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dropbox, Inc.. Motion Offense, LLC served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 14, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Motion Offense, LLC on 8/14/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Dropbox, Inc. (nmg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,021,052 B1; 10,013,158 B1. (nmg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Patent Infringement filed against Motion Offense, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2708512.) - filed by Dropbox, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dropbox, Inc. v. Motion Offense, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motion Offense, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dropbox, Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?