Conformis, Inc. v. Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Conformis, Inc.
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc. and Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01528
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Conformis, Inc.. Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Vrana, Robert)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Conformis, Inc.. Zimmer, Inc. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Vrana, Robert)
October 7, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. on 10/7/2019; Zimmer, Inc. on 10/7/2019. (lak)
August 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 16, 2019 No Summons Issued. (kmd)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Conformis, Inc.. (kmd)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,377,129; 8,460,304; 9,186,161; 9,295,482. (kmd)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2709672.) - filed by Conformis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Exhibit E-F, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conformis, Inc. v. Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conformis, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Represented By: Karen L. Pascale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?