Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC v. Google LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Google LLC and YouTube LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01529
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack B. Blumenfeld on behalf of Google LLC, YouTube LLC (Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 16, 2019 Filing 57 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 9/16/2019. (lak)
August 16, 2019 Filing 56 Record of case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 2:18-cv-00466. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Krista Sue Schwartz terminated. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/6/2019. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as Counsel by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel - Krista Schwartz)(Hendershot, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael E Jones terminated. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/1/2019. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 52 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Michael E. Jones by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elizabeth L DeRieux terminated. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/24/2019. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 Motion to Change Venue/Transfer to the District of Delaware. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/22/2019. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 48 Joint MOTION to Change Venue /Transfer to the District of Delaware by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #41 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Responses due by 7/25/2019. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/15/2019. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 45 REDACTION to #44 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hipskind, #2 Exhibit 29, #3 Exhibit 30, #4 Exhibit 31)(Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
July 5, 2019 Filing 44 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #17 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) and Declarations filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hipskind, #2 Exhibit 29, #3 Exhibit 30, #4 Exhibit 31)(Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 43 REDACTION to #41 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exh. A - 2019-06-07 Patrick Orr DDT MMT 1404 Declaration_REDACTED, #2 Exh. B - Richard Shen _ LinkedIn, #3 Exh. C - 8,135,073 Patent, #4 Exh. D - 7,542,041 Patent, #5 Exh. E - Santanu Dutta _ LinkedIn, #6 Exh. F - Timothy Lohse _ People _ DLA Piper Global Law Firm, #7 Exh. G - Andrew B. Schwaab, #8 Exh. H - '073 Patent File History excerpt, #9 Exh. I - Thomas H Ham, Patent Attorney, Biography, #10 Exh. J - David Alberti _ Feinberg Day Alberti Lim & Belloli LLP, #11 Exh. K - '054 Patent File History excerpt, #12 Exh. L - Mike Ure _ LinkedIn, #13 Exh. M - '689 Patent File History excerpt, #14 Exh. N - '112 Patent File History excerpt, #15 Exh. O - '112 Patent File History excerpt, #16 Exh. P - '529 Patent File History excerpt, #17 Exh. Q - '041 Patent File History excerpt, #18 Exh. S - Table C-5, #19 Exh. T - National Judicial Caseload profile, #20 Exh. U - '041 Patent File History excerpt, #21 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Krista) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 42 REDACTION to #40 Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Fully redacted, #2 Ex B - Fully redacted, #3 Ex C - Fully redacted, #4 Ex D - Fully redacted, #5 Ex E - Fully redacted)(Schwartz, Krista) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 41 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exh. A - 2019-06-07 Patrick Orr DDT MMT 1404 Declaration, #2 Exh. B - Richard Shen _ LinkedIn, #3 Exh. C - 8,135,073 Patent, #4 Exh. D - 7,542,041 Patent, #5 Exh. E - Santanu Dutta _ LinkedIn, #6 Exh. F - Timothy Lohse _ People _ DLA Piper Global Law Firm, #7 Exh. G - Andrew B. Schwaab, #8 Exh. H - '073 Patent File History excerpt, #9 Exh. I - Thomas H Ham, Patent Attorney, Biography, #10 Exh. J - David Alberti _ Feinberg Day Alberti Lim & Belloli LLP, #11 Exh. K - '054 Patent File History excerpt, #12 Exh. L - Mike Ure _ LinkedIn, #13 Exh. M - '689 Patent File History excerpt, #14 Exh. N - '112 Patent File History excerpt, #15 Exh. O - '112 Patent File History excerpt, #16 Exh. P - '529 Patent File History excerpt, #17 Exh. Q - '041 Patent File History excerpt, #18 Exh. R - '450 Patent File History excerpt, #19 Exh. S - Table C-5, #20 Exh. T - National Judicial Caseload Profile, #21 Exh. U - '041 Patent File History excerpt, #22 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Krista) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 40 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #17 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) and Declarations filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - 2019-05-24 McCallion depo excerpts, #2 Ex B - McCallion Exhibit 3, #3 Ex C - 2019-05-10 Pandian depo excerpts, #4 Ex D - 2019-05-15 Livingston depo excerpts, #5 Ex E - GOOG-DDT-00000593 GUT Ticket 35055797)(Schwartz, Krista) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 39 REDACTION to #37 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,, by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hipskind, #2 Exhibit 1, 8-15, 18-24, 27 and 28 Remain Under Seal)(Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 38 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #37 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 16, #8 Exhibit 17, #9 Exhibit 25, #10 Exhibit 26, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 37 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #17 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) and Declarations filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hipskind, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 13, #9 Exhibit 14, #10 Exhibit 15, #11 Exhibit 18, #12 Exhibit 19, #13 Exhibit 20, #14 Exhibit 21, #15 Exhibit 22, #16 Exhibit 23, #17 Exhibit 24, #18 Exhibit 27, #19 Exhibit 28)(Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #17 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) and Declarations Responses due by 6/14/2019. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/10/2019. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) and Declarations by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/4/2019. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Limited Venue Discovery) by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CONSOLIDATION ORDER - the Court ORDERS that the above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action (2:18-cv-459) shall serve as the lead. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/15/19. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to Take Limited Venue Discovery and for Extension of Time on Briefing to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/14/2019. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION Motion for Leave to Take Limited Venue Discovery and for Extension of Time on Briefing to Motion to Dismiss re #17 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) and Declarations by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Venue Discovery, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Christopher Hendershot on behalf of Google LLC, YouTube, LLC (Hendershot, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(3) and 12(B)(6). Deadline for DDT to file its Response to the motion is extended to 2/14/2019. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/7/2019. (slo, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) and Declarations by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #17 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) and Declarations Responses due by 2/7/2019. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/31/2019. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Krista Sue Schwartz on behalf of Google LLC, YouTube, LLC (Schwartz, Krista) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) and Declarations by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC (Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 22 REDACTION to #17 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) and Declarations by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Lim Declaration, #2 Exhibit D - Durbin Declaration, #3 Exhibit E - McCallion Declaration)(Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Motion to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) and Declarations. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/14/2019. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by YouTube, LLC identifying Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Google, LLC, Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc for YouTube, LLC. (Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc for Google LLC. (Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 18 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #17 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) and Declarations.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Cupp v. Symantec, #2 Exhibit B: Petition for Rehearing, #3 Exhibit F: 8,787,454, #4 Exhibit G: 10,003,793, #5 Exhibit H: BMC Software)(Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 17 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) and Declarations by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C: Sealed Declaration, #2 Exhibit D: Sealed Declaration, #3 Exhibit E: Sealed Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Motion to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) and Declarations by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
November 29, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for YouTube, LLC to 1/11/2019. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 15 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re YouTube, LLC.( Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
November 29, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for YouTube, LLC to 12/28/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re YouTube, LLC.( Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google LLC to 1/11/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google LLC to 12/27/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
November 12, 2018 Filing 13 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google LLC.( Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
November 12, 2018 Filing 12 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google LLC.( Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. YouTube, LLC served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. Google LLC served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
November 6, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Benjamin Hanson on behalf of Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC (Hanson, Eric) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dorian S. Berger on behalf of Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC (Berger, Dorian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Daniel P. Hipskind on behalf of Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC (Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC (Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Google LLC, YouTube, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7013702.), filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hipskind, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC v. Google LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?