United States of America v. Sabre Corporation et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Sandler Capital Partners V, L.P., Farelogix, Inc., Sabre Corporation and Sabre GLBL Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01548
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:25
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin L. Craig on behalf of United States of America (Craig, Erin)
September 13, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Hanna on behalf of United States of America (Hanna, Brian)
September 13, 2019 Filing 27 Letter to the Court from Counsel for the United States regarding Assignment to Magistrate. (Elmer, Julie)
September 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 9/12/2019. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #24 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/12/19. (ntl)
September 11, 2019 Filing 26 Letter to Judge Stark from Brian Baker (Reporter, MLEX) regarding participation in the scheduling teleconference scheduled for September 12, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. (etg)
September 10, 2019 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order - filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 -- Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit Ex. A to Proposed Scheduling Order, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 -- Parties Timing Agreement)(Cottafavi, Vittorio)
September 10, 2019 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER Joint Proposed Stipulated Protective Order by United States of America. (Cottafavi, Vittorio)
September 10, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Farelogix, Inc., Sandler Capital Partners V, L.P..(Mason, Daniel)
September 10, 2019 Filing 22 First ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sabre Corporation, Sabre GLBL Inc..(Larkin, Joseph)
September 9, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Jonathan S. Kanter, Daniel J. Howley, Kenneth A. Gallo, Joseph J. Bial for Farelogix, Inc. and Sandler Capital Partners V, L.P. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
September 6, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Tara L. Reinhart for Sabre Corporation and Sabre GLBL Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status and scheduling teleconference has been scheduled for September 12, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. Defendants' counsel shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. The parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit their proposal to the Court no later than September 10, 2019. The parties are to review the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Stark, Forms). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/6/19. (ntl)
September 6, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven C. Sunshine for Sabre Corporation, for Sabre GLBL Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 6, 2019 Filing 20 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Laura D. Hatcher regarding Scheduling of Status Conference - re #19 Letter. (Hatcher, Laura)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tara L. Reinhart filed by Sabre Corporation, Sabre GLBL Inc., #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven C. Sunshine filed by Sabre Corporation, Sabre GLBL Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/6/19. (ntl)
September 5, 2019 Filing 19 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark, Chief Judge from Counsel regarding Initial Status Conference. (Larkin, Joseph)
September 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Vittorio E. Cottafavi on behalf of United States of America (Cottafavi, Vittorio)
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tara L. Reinhart - filed by Sabre Corporation, Sabre GLBL Inc.. (Larkin, Joseph)
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven C. Sunshine - filed by Sabre Corporation, Sabre GLBL Inc.. (Larkin, Joseph)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel J. Howley filed by Sandler Capital Partners V, L.P., Farelogix, Inc., #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan S. Kanter filed by Sandler Capital Partners V, L.P., Farelogix, Inc., #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth A. Gallo filed by Sandler Capital Partners V, L.P., Farelogix, Inc., #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph J. Bial filed by Sandler Capital Partners V, L.P., Farelogix, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/4/19. (ntl)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Farelogix, Inc., Sandler Capital Partners V, L.P.. (Mason, Daniel)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel J. Howley - filed by Farelogix, Inc., Sandler Capital Partners V, L.P.. (Mason, Daniel)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph J. Bial - filed by Farelogix, Inc., Sandler Capital Partners V, L.P.. (Mason, Daniel)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan S. Kanter - filed by Farelogix, Inc., Sandler Capital Partners V, L.P.. (Mason, Daniel)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth A. Gallo - filed by Farelogix, Inc., Sandler Capital Partners V, L.P.. (Mason, Daniel)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Alan Mason on behalf of Farelogix, Inc., Sandler Capital Partners V, L.P. (Mason, Daniel)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by United States of America: For Sandler Capital Partners V, L.P. waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Hatcher, Laura)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by United States of America: For Farelogix, Inc. waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Hatcher, Laura)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by United States of America: For Sabre GLBL Inc. waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Hatcher, Laura)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by United States of America: For Sabre Corporation waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Hatcher, Laura)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Sabre Corporation for Sabre Corporation, Sabre GLBL Inc. filed by Sabre Corporation, Sabre GLBL Inc.. (Larkin, Joseph)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph O. Larkin on behalf of Sabre Corporation, Sabre GLBL Inc. (Larkin, Joseph)
August 28, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie S. Elmer on behalf of United States of America (Elmer, Julie)
August 20, 2019 No Summons Issued. (mal)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Farelogix, Inc., Sabre Corporation, Sabre GLBL Inc. and Sandler Capital Partners V, L.P. (Filing Fee Waived) - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Sabre Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandler Capital Partners V, L.P.
Represented By: Daniel J. Howley
Represented By: Joseph J. Bial
Represented By: Jonathan S. Kanter
Represented By: Kenneth A. Gallo
Represented By: Daniel Alan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farelogix, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Howley
Represented By: Joseph J. Bial
Represented By: Jonathan S. Kanter
Represented By: Kenneth A. Gallo
Represented By: Daniel Alan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabre Corporation
Represented By: Steven C. Sunshine
Represented By: Tara L. Reinhart
Represented By: Joseph O. Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabre GLBL Inc.
Represented By: Steven C. Sunshine
Represented By: Tara L. Reinhart
Represented By: Joseph O. Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Laura D. Hatcher
Represented By: Brian E. Hanna
Represented By: Erin L. Craig
Represented By: Julie S. Elmer
Represented By: Vittorio E. Cottafavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?