Kennedy v. Stark et al
Plaintiff: Edward Thomas Kennedy
Defendant: Leonard P. Stark, Colm F. Connolly and Richard G. Andrews
Case Number: 1:2019cv01641
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTIONS by Edward Thomas Kennedy to D.I. #5 Order Dismissing Case. (myr)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (copy to pltf.) (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/18/2019. (kmd)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - D.I. #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Plaintiff shall pay the $400.00 filing fee within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order or the case will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/12/2019. (amf)
September 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT - filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against Richard G. Andrews, Colm F. Connolly, Leonard P. Stark - filed by Edward Thomas Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Edward Thomas Kennedy. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. Stark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard P. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colm F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard G. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Thomas Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?