Banks et al v. E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company et al
Plaintiff: Doris Banks, Christine Wootten, Gene Sullenberger, Bruce Davis and Candy Caporale
Defendant: Procino Plating, Inc., The 3M Company, Procino, E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, Procino Enterprises, Blades Development LLC and The Chemours Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01672
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Procino Plating to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 2, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Procino Plating, Inc. answer due 12/2/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/31/2019. (dlw)
October 31, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Procino Plating to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 2, 2019 - filed by Doris Banks, Candy Caporale, Bruce Davis, Gene Sullenberger, Christine Wootten. (Hrubiec, R.) Modified on 10/31/2019 (dlw).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #23 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re Briefing Deadlines re D.I. 21 and D.I. 22 (Set Briefing Schedule: re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Answering Brief due 12/3/2019. Reply Brief due 12/31/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/28/2019. (dlw)
October 28, 2019 Filing 23 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re Briefing Deadlines re D.I. 21 and D.I. 22 to - filed by Doris Banks, Candy Caporale, Bruce Davis, Gene Sullenberger, Christine Wootten. (Hrubiec, R.)
October 15, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 22 has been replaced on the docket with a version that complies with this Court's Local Rules and Judge Noreika's Preferences and Procedures. The footnotes now appear in 12 point type. (dlw)
October 15, 2019 Set Briefing Schedule: re #8 MOTION to Remand - Answering Brief due 11/8/2019. Reply Brief due 12/6/2019. (dlw)
October 15, 2019 Set Briefing Schedule: re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Answering Briefs due 11/22/2019. Reply Briefs due 12/20/2019. (dlw)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #20 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re Briefing Deadlines to /re: D.I. 8 and D.I. 16. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/15/2019. (dlw)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re Briefing Deadlines re: D.I. 8 and D.I.14. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/15/2019. (dlw)
October 11, 2019 Filing 22 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Blades Development LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/25/2019. (Tome, Brian) (Main Document 22 replaced on 10/15/2019) (dlw).
October 11, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Blades Development LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tome, Brian)
October 11, 2019 Filing 20 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re Briefing Deadlines to /re: D.I. 8 and D.I. 16 - filed by E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company. (Ferguson, Travis)
October 11, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re Briefing Deadlines re: D.I. 8 and D.I.14 to - filed by The 3M Company. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to 10/11/2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Blades Development LLC answer due 10/11/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/8/2019. (dlw)
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to 10/11/2019 - filed by Blades Development LLC. (Tome, Brian) Modified on 10/8/2019 (dlw).
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dupre, Andrew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dupre, Andrew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by The 3M Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/18/2019. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by The 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Farnan, Kelly)
October 4, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joshua D. Yount for The 3M Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to 10/04/2019, #10 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time, #13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re: Procino Plating Answer to Complaint to October 31, 2019, #11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re: Answer to Complaint to October 4, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Blades Development LLC answer due 10/4/2019; E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company answer due 10/4/2019; Procino Plating, Inc. answer due 10/31/2019; The 3M Company answer due 10/4/2019; The Chemours Company answer due 10/4/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/1/2019. (dlw)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re: Procino Plating Answer to Complaint to October 31, 2019 - filed by Doris Banks, Candy Caporale, Bruce Davis, Gene Sullenberger, Christine Wootten. (Hrubiec, R.)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to 10/04/2019 - filed by Blades Development LLC. (Tome, Brian)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re: Answer to Complaint to October 4, 2019 - filed by The 3M Company. (Farnan, Kelly)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint to October 4, 2019 and Proposed Order by E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company. (Ferguson, Travis) Modified on 10/1/2019 (dlw).
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Doris Banks, Candy Caporale, Bruce Davis, Gene Sullenberger, Christine Wootten.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hrubiec, R.)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand - filed by Doris Banks, Candy Caporale, Bruce Davis, Gene Sullenberger, Christine Wootten. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hrubiec, R.)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard F. Bulger, Michael A. Olsen, Joshua D. Yount and Tyler D. Alfermann filed by The 3M Company. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/27/2019. (dlw)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard F. Bulger, Michael A. Olsen, Joshua D. Yount and Tyler D. Alfermann - filed by The 3M Company. (Farnan, Kelly)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 Proposed STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to 9/30/2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Blades Development LLC answer due 9/30/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/23/2019. (dlw)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 by The 3M Company. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 9/23/2019 (dlw).
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to 9/30/2019 - filed by Blades Development LLC. (Tome, Brian)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company to answer Plaintiffs' Complaint to September 30, 2019, #3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re: Answer to Complaint to September 30, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company answer due 9/30/2019; The 3M Company answer due 9/30/2019; The Chemours Company answer due 9/30/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/11/2019. (dlw)
September 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company to answer Plaintiffs' Complaint to September 30, 2019 - filed by E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company. (Ferguson, Travis)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re: Answer to Complaint to September 30, 2019 - filed by The 3M Company. (Farnan, Kelly)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Superior Court of the State of Delaware, Case Number S19C-05-024 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2725145)- filed by E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, The 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Kelly E. Farnan, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks et al v. E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Procino Plating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 3M Company
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Joshua D. Yount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Procino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company
Represented By: Travis John Ferguson
Represented By: Andrew S. Dupre
Represented By: Janine L. Faben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Procino Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blades Development LLC
Represented By: Brian Tome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Represented By: Travis John Ferguson
Represented By: Andrew S. Dupre
Represented By: Janine L. Faben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Banks
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Wootten
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Sullenberger
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Davis
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candy Caporale
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?