Dominelli v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Plaintiff: Francine Dominelli
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 1:2019cv01677
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston answer due 11/29/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/1/2019. (nms)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Shauger, Dean) Modified on 11/1/2019 (nms).
October 1, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Erik W. Berger for Francine Dominelli added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Francine Dominelli: For All Defendants. (Kassab, Vanessa)
September 16, 2019 Remark: Summons mailed to Plaintiff's counsel per party's request. (myr) Modified on 9/16/2019 (nms).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erik W. Berger, filed by Francine Dominelli. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/12/2019. (nms)
September 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erik W. Berger - filed by Francine Dominelli. (myr)
September 9, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston on 9/9/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2725972.) - filed by Francine Dominelli. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominelli v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine Dominelli
Represented By: Vanessa L. Kassab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?