Davis v. D.R. Horton Inc.
Plaintiff: Lauren Davis
Defendant: D.R. Horton Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01686
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Alessandra Glorioso regarding Defendant's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint - re #11 MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Letter)(Glorioso, Alessandra)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint - filed by D.R. Horton Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint)(Glorioso, Alessandra)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION re #9 Opening Brief in Support of Scott D. Goldsmith by D.R. Horton Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to Declaration, #5 Exhibit E to Declaration)(Glorioso, Alessandra)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by D.R. Horton Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/22/2019. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by D.R. Horton Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Glorioso, Alessandra)
October 7, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Scott D. Goldsmith for D.R. Horton Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant D.R. Horton, Inc. to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to November 8, 2019 filed by D.R. Horton Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/4/19. (ntl)
October 3, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alexandra N. Krasovec for D.R. Horton Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
October 1, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Aaron D. Radbil for Lauren Davis added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aaron D. Radbil filed by Lauren Davis, #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott Goldsmith and Alexandra N. Krasovec filed by D.R. Horton Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/1/19. (ntl)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott Goldsmith and Alexandra N. Krasovec - filed by D.R. Horton Inc.. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant D.R. Horton, Inc. to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to November 8, 2019 - filed by D.R. Horton Inc.. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alessandra Glorioso on behalf of D.R. Horton Inc. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
September 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lauren Davis. D.R. Horton Inc. served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aaron D. Radbil - filed by Lauren Davis. (Bennett, Blake)
September 10, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to D.R. Horton Inc. on 9/10/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against D.R. Horton Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2726970.) - filed by Lauren Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. D.R. Horton Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.R. Horton Inc.
Represented By: Alessandra Glorioso
Represented By: Alexandra N. Krasovec
Represented By: Scott D. Goldsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Davis
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Represented By: Aaron D. Radbil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?