Pauly v. Sterling Bancorp
Plaintiff: Robert Pauly
Defendant: Sterling Bancorp
Case Number: 1:2019cv01697
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 11/12/2019, at 3:45 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/23/2019. (nms)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sterling Bancorp.(Measley, Dean) Modified on 10/22/2019 (nms).
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SO ORDERED Granting #6 TIPULATION and Order to Withdraw Request for Default and Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Sterling Bancorp answer due 10/22/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/8/2019. (nms)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION and Order to Withdraw Request for Default and Extend Time - filed by Sterling Bancorp. (Measley, Dean) Modified on 10/8/2019 (nms).
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean McKinley Measley on behalf of Sterling Bancorp (Measley, Dean)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Default as to Sterling Bancorp - filed by Robert Pauly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian)
September 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Pauly. Sterling Bancorp served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Farnan, Michael)
September 11, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Sterling Bancorp on 9/11/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Sterling Bancorp - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2727967.) - filed by Robert Pauly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pauly v. Sterling Bancorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Pauly
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Bancorp
Represented By: Dean McKinley Measley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?