Clifford v. Lending Club Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Clifford, Jr.
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Lending Club Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01709
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to November 15, 2019 filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/17/19. (ntl)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to November 15, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 15, 2019 filed by Lending Club Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/15/19. (ntl)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 15, 2019 - filed by Lending Club Corporation. (Giusini, Brittany)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Clifford, Jr. Lending Club Corporation served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Clifford, Jr. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
September 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 12, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Equifax Information Services, LLC and Lending Club Corporation on 9/12/2019. (*Summons mailed to counsel's Philadelphia office.) (amf)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC and Lending Club Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2729098) - filed by Timothy Clifford, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifford v. Lending Club Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lending Club Corporation
Represented By: Brittany M. Giusini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Clifford, Jr.
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?