Weller v. Wilkinson et al
Plaintiff: Dustin Weller
Defendant: Scott A. Beardsley, Raymond O. Huggenberger, Loren L. McFarland, Scott Wilkinson, R. Scott Greer, Heath Lukatch, Heather Rider, Alison K. Bauerlein, Benjamin M. Anderson-Ray and Heather D. Rider
Nominal Defendant: Inogen, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01723
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dustin Weller: (Bennett, Blake)
October 25, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dustin Weller: (Bennett, Blake)
October 25, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dustin Weller: (Bennett, Blake)
October 25, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dustin Weller: (Bennett, Blake)
October 25, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dustin Weller: (Bennett, Blake)
October 25, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dustin Weller: (Bennett, Blake)
October 25, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dustin Weller: (Bennett, Blake)
October 25, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dustin Weller: (Bennett, Blake)
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dustin Weller: (Bennett, Blake)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dustin Weller: (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Weller. Heather D. Rider served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Weller. Loren L. McFarland served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Weller. Scott A. Beardsley served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Weller. Benjamin M. Anderson-Ray served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Weller. Raymond O. Huggenberger served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Weller. Heath Lukatch served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Weller. Alison K. Bauerlein served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Weller. Scott Wilkinson served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Weller. R. Scott Greer served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Weller. Inogen, Inc. served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
September 23, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Benjamin M. Anderson-Ray; Alison K. Bauerlein; Scott A. Beardsley; R. Scott Greer; Raymond O. Huggenberger; Inogen, Inc.; Heath Lukatch; Loren L. McFarland; Heather D. Rider; and Scott Wilkinson on 9/23/2019. (*2 copies of each summons issued) (amf)
September 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 13, 2019 No Summons Issued. (kmd)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 Verified Stockholder Derivative COMPLAINT for Violations of Federal Securities Laws, Breach of Fiduciary Duty, Waste of Corporate Assets, and Unjust Enrichment filed with Jury Demand against Benjamin M. Anderson-Ray, Alison K. Bauerlein, Scott A. Beardsley, R. Scott Greer, Raymond O. Huggenberger, Inogen, Inc., Heath Lukatch, Loren L. McFarland, Heather Rider, Scott Wilkinson - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2730353.) - filed by Dustin Weller. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weller v. Wilkinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott A. Beardsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond O. Huggenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren L. McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Scott Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath Lukatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Rider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison K. Bauerlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin M. Anderson-Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather D. Rider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Weller
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Inogen, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?