Allergan USA, Inc., et al. v. MSN Laboratories Private Limited, et al.
Plaintiff: Eden Biodesign, LLC. and Eden Biodesign, LLC
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited, Hetero USA Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Hetero Labs Limited and Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Counter Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc. and Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company
Counter Claimant: MSN Laboratories Private Limited, Alkem Laboratories Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01727
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 396 REDACTED VERSION of #388 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 8/10/2022 (nms).
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 395 REPLY BRIEF re #374 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Amended Complaint filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Weinblatt, Richard)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 394 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Cory Berkland, Ph.D. on August 11, 2022, beginning at 9:00 a.m. EST. (remote) filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 393 REDACTED VERSION of #384 Letter, by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 8/8/2022 (nms).
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORAL ORDER: The Court has read the letters concerning a partial summary judgment motion by MSN. (D.I. #376 , #384 , #391 ). Plaintiffs DOE theory for the 179 and 792 patents appears to be that lactose is the equivalent of silicified microcrystalline cellulose and that croscamellose sodium is the equivalent of crospovidone. Defendant wants to brief whether this theory is barred by prosecution history estoppel. MSNs argument is based on the prosecution history of the parent. I am not persuaded by MSNs letter that there is a strong likelihood that I would be able to grant MSN summary judgment on the two patents in question. I also note the inefficiency, as I believe the two patents are also asserted against co-defendant Sun (D.I. 375 at 2 (validity challenge)), so I am going to hear about them at trial regardless. MSNs request (D.I. #376 ) is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/8/2022. (nms)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Hassen Sayeed for Allergan USA, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (smg)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 391 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Richard C. Weinblatt, regarding reply in support of request for leave to file a Motion for Summary Judgment. (Weinblatt, Richard) Modified on 8/5/2022 (nms).
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 390 SO ORDERED Granting #389 Stipulation and Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/3/2022. (nms)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 389 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding the Reply Expert Report of Maureen D. Donovan, Ph.D., Regarding Noninfringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 9,675,587 and 10,188,632 by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Conference held on 8/3/2022. Local counsel present for Plaintiff: J. Tigan. Local counsel present for Defendant MSN; R. Weinblatt. Local counsel present for Sun; D. Gattuso. The request for a three day trial was confirmed by the Court. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi.) (nms)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 388 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #374 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Amended Complaint filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F)(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORAL ORDER: Defendant Suns request for leave to file a summary judgment motion re: DOE of the colloidal silica limitation (D.I. #366 ) is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/2/2022. (nms)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 386 REDACTED VERSION of #376 Letter by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weinblatt, Richard)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 385 Joint Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Jeremy A. Tigan, regarding length of trial. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 8/2/2022 (nms).
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 384 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Jeremy A. Tigan, regarding opposition to MSN's request for leave to file for summary judgment of non-infringement (D.I. #376 ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 8/2/2022 (nms).
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 383 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Reply Expert Report of Colin W. Howden, M.D. filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 382 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Reply Expert Declaration of Cory Berkland, Ph.D. Regarding Infringement of Asserted Patents by Sun filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 381 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Reply Expert Declaration of Cory Berkland, Ph.D. Regarding Infringement of Asserted Patents by MSN filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 380 REDACTED VERSION of #374 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Amended Complaint by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Weinblatt, Richard)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 379 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Reply Expert Report of Richard A. Gemeinhart, Ph.D., Regarding Invalidity and Unenforceability of U.S. Patent Nos. 9,675,587, 10,188,632, 11,007,179, 11,090,291, 111,160,792, 11,229,627 and 11,311,516 filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 378 REDACTED VERSION of #373 Letter, by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 7/29/2022 (nms)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 377 REDACTED VERSION of #375 Letter, by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Gattuso, Dominick)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 376 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Richard C. Weinblatt, regarding request for leave to file a motion for summary judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weinblatt, Richard) Modified on 7/26/2022 (nms).
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 375 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Dominick T. Gattuso, Esq., regarding reply to request to file motion for leave to file summary judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 7/26/2022 (nms).
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Answering Brief Deadline re #374 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Amended Complaint. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/5/2022. (nms)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 374 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Amended Complaint - filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Weinblatt, Richard) Modified on 7/24/2022 (nms).
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 373 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding Defendant's letter requesting leave to file summary judgment - re #366 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exs. 1-6)(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 372 REDACTED VERSION of #366 Letter, by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Certificate of Service)(Gattuso, Dominick)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 371 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responsive Expert Report of Cory Berkland, Ph.D., regarding the Validity of the Asserted Patents (Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 370 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responsive Expert Report of Cory Berkland, Ph.D., regarding the Validity of the Asserted Patents (MSN Defendants) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 369 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Reply Expert Report of Maureen D. Donovan, Ph.D., Regarding Noninfringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 9,675,587 and 10,188,632 (with Exhibits 1-2) [CONFIDENTIAL] filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 368 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Raj Suryanarayanan filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORAL ORDER: A conference to discuss trial length is now set for 8/3/2022, at 3:00 PM. The conference will be held virtually using TEAMS. A joint email with the email addresses for all those participating in the conference is due to the Case Manager by 4:00 PM on 7/27/2022. Further, the Court requests that the parties submit a letter 24 hours before the conference explaining why four days (28 hours) are necessary for trial. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/14/2022. (nms)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 366 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Dominick T. Gattuso, Esq., regarding request to file Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B, #2 Certificate of Service)(Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 7/14/2022 (nms).
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 365 SO ORDERED Granting Stipulation and Proposed Order to Consolidate and Extend Time (see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/12/2022. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01479-RGA, 1:19-cv-01727-RGA(nms)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 364 Joint Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Jeremy A. Tigan, regarding the length and format of trial. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 7/6/2022 (nms).
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 363 REPLY BRIEF re #354 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims and to Strike Affirmative Defenses MOTION to Strike #349 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 362 REDACTED VERSION of #359 Declaration by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-V, #2 Certificate of Service)(Gattuso, Dominick)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 361 REDACTED VERSION of #358 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gattuso, Dominick)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 360 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Expert Declaration of Cory Berkland, Ph.D. Regarding Infringement of Asserted Patents by MSN and (2) Expert Declaration of Susan J. Bogdanowich-Knipp, Ph.D. Regarding Analysis of MSN's ANDA Products filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 359 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #358 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-V, #2 Certificate of Service)(Gattuso, Dominick)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 358 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #354 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims and to Strike Affirmative Defenses MOTION to Strike #349 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gattuso, Dominick)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 357 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Opening Expert Report of Richard A. Gemeinhart, Ph.D., Regarding Invalidity and Unenforceability of U.S. Patent Nos. 9,675,587, 10,188,632, 11,007,179, 11,090,291, 111,160,792, 11,229,627 and 11,311,516 filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 356 DECLARATION of Carolyn S. Wall re #354 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims and to Strike Affirmative Defenses, by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 6/13/2022 (nms).
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 355 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #354 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims and to Strike Affirmative Defenses, filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/24/2022. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 6/13/2022 (nms).
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 354 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims and to Strike Affirmative Defenses - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 6/13/2022 (nms).
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 353 SO ORDERED Granting #352 Stipulation and Proposed Order regarding certifications to the FDA and withdrawal of claims of infringement.Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/2/2022. (nms)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 352 STIPULATION Regarding U.S. Patent Nos. 8,691,860, 9,115,091, 9,364,489, 9,789,125 and 7,741,356 by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ANSWER to #345 Answer to Amended Complaint and Counterclaims, by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 6/1/2022 (nms).
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 350 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Final Invalidity and Unenforceability Contentions Regarding U.S. Patent Nos. 11,229,627 and 11,311,516 filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 349 AMENDED ANSWER to #343 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and COUNTERCLAIMS against All Plaintiffs, by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. (Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 5/31/2022 (nms).
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 348 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Final Claim Charts for Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited, Relating Each Accused Product to the Asserted Claim filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 347 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Final Claim Charts for Defendants MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc. Relating Each Accused Product to the Asserted Claims filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ANSWER to #343 Amended Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs, by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 5/16/2022 (nms).
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ANSWER to #341 Amended Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC, by MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Limited.(Weinblatt, Richard) Modified on 5/16/2022 (nms).
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 344 Amended Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 11,229,627 B1 ;11,311,516 B2. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 4/28/2022 (nms).
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 343 FIRST Amended Complaint against Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited - filed by Eden Biodesign, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 4/28/2022 (nms).
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 342 Amended Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 11,229,627 B1 ;11,311,516 B2. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 4/28/2022 (nms).
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 341 FIRST Amended Complaint against MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - filed by Eden Biodesign, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 4/28/2022 (nms).
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 340 SO ORDERED Granting #339 Stipulation and Proposed Order regarding amended pleadings deadline, service and answer deadline. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/18/2022. (nms)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 339 STIPULATION Regarding Filing and Service of Amended Complaints and Answers Thereto by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Pursuant to the Court's #Standing Order No. 2022-2, dated March 14, 2022, "[u]nless otherwise directed by the Court, Magistrate Judges will no longer engage in alternative dispute resolution of patent and securities cases." See also 28 U.S.C. 652(b). (Taylor, Daniel)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 338 SO ORDERED Granting Stipulation and Proposed Order to Consolidate Cases and Modify Scheduling Order (D.I. 7 in 22-cv-182-RGA; D.I. 337 in 19-cv-1727-RGA; D.I. 7 in 22-cv-181-RGA). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/22/2022. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01727-RGA, 1:22-cv-00181-RGA, 1:22-cv-00182-RGA(nms)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 337 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Consolidate Cases and Modify Scheduling Order by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 336 STIPULATION to Modify Scheduling Order by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. (Gattuso, Dominick)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #336 Stipulation and Order to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/15/2022. (nms)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 335 SO ORDERED Granting #334 Amended Stipulation and Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/24/2022. (nms)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 334 AMENDED Stipulation of Dismissal by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/24/2022 (nms).
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 333 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Modify Scheduling Order by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #333 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/22/2022. (nms)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 332 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Joint Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-7) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 331 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Joint Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-7) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 330 SO ORDERED Granting #329 Stipulation of Dismissal between Plaintiffs and Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/9/2022. (nms)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 329 STIPULATION of Dismissal between Plaintiffs and Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/9/2022 (nms).
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 328 SO ORDERED Granting #327 Stipulation and Proposed Order of Dismissal between Plaintiffs and Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/9/2022. (nms)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 327 STIPULATION of Dismissal between Plaintiffs and Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/10/2022 (nms).
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Tedd W. Van Buskirk for MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #326 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tedd W. Van Buskirk, filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/2/2022. (nms)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 326 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tedd W. Van Buskirk - filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Weinblatt, Richard)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Remark: The filing submitted for in camera review under the cover of D.I. #319 has been destroyed per Defense counsel's consent. (nms)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 325 REDACTED VERSION of #294 Letter, by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Weinblatt, Richard)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 324 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Fourth Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 10-11) filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Kraman, Pilar)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 323 AMENDED REDACTED VERSION of #296 Sealed Exhibits, by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 1/21/2022 (nms).
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER: The request (D.I. #293 ) is DENIED. The hearing scheduled for 1/24/2022, is CANCELLED (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/31/2022. (nms)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER: Regarding Allegran's request to conduct depositions of individuals employed by Sun and by MSN in India. (D.I. #294 , #295 , #300 , #301 ). Since the deponents can provide relevant first-hand testimony, Allergan has been judicious in its use of its allotted time, and the burdens on the deponents and Sun and MSN are not great, the request for protective orders as to Mona Dhaliwal, Sant Singh, and Ashish Malani, all of Sun, and Ravikumar Nithiyanandam and Sajja Eswaraiah of MSN are DENIED. The requests for a protective order as to Devender Dagar of Sun and N. Santhosh Kumar, Rama Mohan, and a further Rule 30(b)(6) deposition as to MSN, which are unopposed, are GRANTED (see Order for other details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/20/2022. (nms)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 320 REVISED REDACTED VERSION of #300 Letter, by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 1/20/2022 (nms).
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from R Touhey Myer, enclosing document for in camera review (see D.I. 311 ). (Myer, R.) Modified on 1/20/2022 (nms).
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORAL ORDER: The redacted filing (D.I. #317 ) is REJECTED because parts of it are redacted in its entirety. Absent a compelling reason, supported by a statement under oath by a party, redactions in their entirety are impermissible; redactions must be done so as to redact the least possible amount of the materials submitted. Failure to make a good faith attempt at such redactions may result in sanctions, the most common of which would be simply unsealing the entire filing. Redacting in its entirety a document that contains publicly available materials is prima facie evidence of bad faith. Revised redacted filings are DUE within five business days. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/20/2022. (nms)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 317 REDACTED VERSION of #294 Letter, by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Weinblatt, Richard)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 316 REDACTED VERSION of #293 Letter by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 315 REDACTED VERSION of #301 Letter, by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 1/19/2022 (nms).
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORAL ORDER: The redacted filings (D.I. #312 ; D.I. #313 ) are REJECTED because parts of them are redacted in their entirety. Absent a compelling reason, supported by a statement under oath by a party, redactions in their entirety are impermissible; redactions must be done so as to redact the least possible amount of the materials submitted. Failure to make a good faith attempt at such redactions may result in sanctions, the most common of which would be simply unsealing the entire filing. Redacting in its entirety a document that contains publicly available materials is prima facie evidence of bad faith. Revised redacted filings are DUE within five business days. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/19/2022. (nms) Modified on 1/26/2022 (nms).
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 313 REDACTED VERSION of #300 Letter by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 312 REDACTED VERSION of #296 Sealed Exhibits 1-3, by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 1/18/2022 (nms).
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORAL ORDER: Aurobindo Defendants are to produce ex parte in camera an unredacted version of D.I. #293 Ex. A as soon as reasonably possible. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/18/2022. (nms)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 310 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc.s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Fourth Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 10-11) filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 309 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Final Claim Charts for Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. Relating Each Accused Product to the Asserted Claims filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 308 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Final Claim Charts for Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited Relating Each Accused Product to the Asserted Claims filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 307 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Final Claim Charts for Defendants MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Relating Each Accused Product to the Asserted Claims filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 306 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Final Claim Charts for Defendants Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. Relating Each Accused Product to the Asserted Claims filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 305 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Aurobindo Pharma LTD., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited, and Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Final Invalidity Contentions regarding U.S. Patent Nos. 11,007,179, 11,090,291, and 11,160,792 filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 304 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 10-11) [CONFIDENTIAL] filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 303 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Modify Case Schedules by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #303 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/14/2022. (nms)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 302 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Joint Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 8-9) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 301 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Jeremy A. Tigan, regarding opposition to Sun's request for a Protective Order (D.I. #295 ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 1/13/2022 (nms).
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 300 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Jeremy A. Tigan, regarding opposition to MSN's request for a Protective Order (D.I. #294 ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 1/13/2022 (nms).
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 299 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from R Touhey Myer, regarding discovery disputes with Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Myer, R.) Modified on 1/12/2022 (nms).
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 298 SO ORDERED Granting #297 Authenticity Stipulation and Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/12/2022. (nms)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 297 AUTHENTICITY Stipulation and Proposed Order between Plaintiffs and Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 1/12/2022 (nms).
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 296 [SEALED] EXHIBITS 1-3 re #295 Letter, by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 1/11/2022 (nms).
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 295 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Dominick T. Gattuso, Esq., regarding Sun's Motion for Protective Order. (Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 1/11/2022 (nms).
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 294 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Richard C. Weinblatt regarding MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Weinblatt, Richard)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 293 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding Discovery Disputes with Aurobindo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 292 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to serve their final contentions with respect to the '179 and '291 patents to January 14, 2022 - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #292 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to serve their final contentions with respect to the '179 and '291 patents to January 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/7/2022. (nms)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 291 SO ORDERED Granting #289 Authenticity Stipulation and Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/3/2022. (nms)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORAL ORDER: The parties (Plaintiffs, SUN, MSN, and Aurobindo) have advised that disputes have arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a discovery conference on 1/24/2022, at 3:30 PM. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. The conference will be held using Teams. A joint email with the email addresses for all those participating in the conference shall be due to the Court's Case Manager by 4:00 PM on 1/18/2022. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/29/2021. (nms)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 289 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Authenticity - by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael P. Hogan for Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER: Regarding the weight to be applied to a Patent Examiner's statement, in a Notice of Allowance, about the meaning of a claim (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/17/2021. (nms)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 287 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kathleen Waldron, Tim Costello, Jens Jozef Ceulemans, Eugeen Maria Jozef Jans, and Philip Erna H. Heyns on a mutually agreed upon date and time (remote) filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Markman Hearing held on 12/16/2021. Counsel for Plaintiffs: J. Tigan. Counsel for Defendants: P. Kraman, R. Weinblatt, D. Gattuso, R. Myer. (Court Reporter Deanna Warner.) (lak)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 286 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 10-11) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Set of Joint Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 8-9) filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Remark: The Markman Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2021, at 9:00 AM will now be held in Courtroom 4A. (lak)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 284 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Kenneth L. Dorsney, Cortlan S. Hitch and Morris James LLP for Aurobindo by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORAL ORDER: The Joint Motion for Claim Construction (D.I. #280 ) is Granted, with the exception that the hearing is limited to a total of one and a half hours with each side being allowed 45 minutes. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/6/2021. (nms)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 282 APPENDIX re #281 Joint Claim Construction Brief, by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 - part 2, #3 Exhibit 2)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 12/6/2021 (nms).
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 281 JOINT Claim Construction Brief, filed by Eden Biodesign, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 12/6/2021 (nms).
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Joint Motion for Claim Construction - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 12/6/2021 (nms).
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 279 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Invalidity Contentions Regarding U.S. Patent Nos. 11,007,179, 11,090,291, and 11,160,792 filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ANSWER to #266 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 277 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ANSWER to #268 Answer to Amended Complaint and Counterclaims, by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 12/1/2021 (nms).
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORAL ORDER: The Markman Hearing is now rescheduled for 12/16/2021, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/29/2021. (nms)
November 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 274 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Charles Weinblatt on behalf of MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Weinblatt, Richard)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 273 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Touhey Myer on behalf of Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. (Myer, R.)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORAL ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the Markman hearing scheduled for January 5, 2022, is CANCELED. The Markman hearing will be rescheduled for a date to be determined. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/18/2021. (nms)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 271 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sheker Reddy Alikicherla and Sajja Eswaraiah on dates and times convenient to the parties (First Amended) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 270 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 269 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc. as to its inequitable conduct counterclaims and affirmative defenses against Plaintiffs (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ANSWER to #257 Amended Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 11/12/2021 (nms).
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ANSWER to #261 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Kraman, Pilar) Modified on 11/10/2021 (nms).
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ANSWER to #259 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and COUNTERCLAIMS against all Plaintiffs, by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 11/10/2021 (nms).
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 265 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Beth A. Swadley by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. (Kraman, Pilar)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ANSWER to #255 Amended Complaint, by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 11/10/2021 (nms).
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 263 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Sixth Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (No. 8) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 11,007,179 B2; 11,090,291 B2; 11,160,792 B2. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/4/2021 (nms).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 261 SECOND Amended Complaint against Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. - filed by Eden Biodesign, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/4/2021 (nms).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 11,007,179 B2; 11,090,291 B2; 11,160,792 B2. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/4/2021 (nms).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 259 SECOND Amended Complaint against Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited - filed by Eden Biodesign, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/4/2021 (nms).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 11,007,179 B2; 11,090,291 B2; 11,160,792 B2. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/4/2021 (nms).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 257 SECOND Amended Complaint against MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - filed by Eden Biodesign, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/4/2021 (nms).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 256 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 11,007,179 B2; 11,090,291 B2; 11,160,792 B2. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/3/2021 (nms).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 255 SECOND Amended Complaint against Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. - filed by Eden Biodesign, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/4/2021 (nms).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 254 SO ORDERED Granting #252 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Construe the Claims of U.S. Patent No. 11,160,792. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/3/2021. (nms)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 253 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/3/2021 (nms).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 252 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Construe the Claims of U.S. Patent No. 11,160,792, by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/3/2021 (nms).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #253 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time, filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC, Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/3/2021. (nms)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 251 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Answering Claim Construction Brief filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 250 SO ORDERED Granting #249 Stipulation of Dismissal (*Party Hetero USA Inc., and Hetero Labs Limited terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/20/2021. (nms)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 249 STIPULATION of Dismissal between Plaintiffs and Defendants Hetero Labs Limited and Hetero USA, Inc., by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/20/2021 (nms).
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 248 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Opening Claim Construction Brief and the (2) Expert Declaration of Cory Berkland, Ph.D. - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael P. Hogan - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 246 SO ORDERED Granting #245 Stipulation and Order (*Party Alkem Laboratories Limited terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/18/2021. (nms)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #247 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael P. Hogan, filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/18/2021. (nms)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 245 STIPULATION of Dismissal between Plaintiffs and Defendant Alkem Laboratories Limited, by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/15/2021 (nms).
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #244 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Defendants MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Counterclaims (D.I. 233) to November 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/12/2021. (nms)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 244 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Defendants MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Counterclaims (D.I. 233) to November 17, 2021 - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Joint Claim Construction Chart, by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-J)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/6/2021 (nms).
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 242 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Sixth Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (No. 8) filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ANSWER to #230 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 240 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Defendants MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Counterclaims (D.I. 233) to November 3, 2021 - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Defendants Hetero Labs Limited and Hetero USA Inc.'s Counterclaims (D.I. 228) to November 3, 2021 - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #239 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Defendants Hetero Labs Limited and Hetero USA Inc.'s Counterclaims to November 3, 2021. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/4/2021. (nms)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #240 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Defendants MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Counterclaims to November 3, 2021. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/4/2021. (nms)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Joint Disclosure of Proposed Claim Terms and Their Proposed Construction filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Joint Requests for Production Regarding the '179 and '291 Patents (Nos. 1-11) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Individual Interrogatories (Nos. 1-2) and Common Interrogatories (Nos. 3,4,6,7,8, and 9) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Individuals listed in notice on dates and times convenient to the parties (First Amended) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Initial Claim Charts for Defendant Alkem Laboratories Limited Relating Each Accused Product to the Asserted Claims, (2) Plaintiffs' Initial Claim Charts for Defendants Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. Relating Each Accused Product to the Asserted Claims, (3) Plaintiffs' Initial Claim Charts for Defendants Hetero Labs Limited and Hetero USA Inc. Relating Each Accused Product to the Asserted Claims, (4) Plaintiffs' Initial Claim Charts for Defendants MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Relating Each Accused Product to the Asserted Claims, (5) Plaintiffs' Initial Claim Charts for Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited Relating Each Accused Product to the Asserted Claims, and (6) Plaintiffs' Initial Claim Charts for Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. Relating Each Accused Product to the Asserted Claims filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ANSWER to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 9/15/2021 (nms).
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint and COUNTERCLAIMS against all Plaintiffs, by Alkem Laboratories Limited.(Phillips, John) Modified on 9/14/2021 (nms).
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ANSWER to Complaint (see C.A. No. 21-1066-RGA), by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Kraman, Pilar) Modified on 9/14/2021 (nms).
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ANSWER to Complaint (see C.A. No. 21-1065) and COUNTERCLAIMS against All Plaintiffs, by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 9/14/2021 (nms).
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint (see C.A. No. 21-1062), by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 9/14/2021 (nms).
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Answer to First Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims for the '179 and '291 Patents (see C.A. No. 21-1063-RGA) against All Plaintiffs, by Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited.(Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 9/13/2021 (nms).
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 227 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Fifth Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (No. 7) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 226 SO ORDERED Granting (D.I. 15 in 21-cv-1062-RGA; D.I. 12 in 21-cv-1064-RGA; D.I. 12 in 21-cv-1061-RGA; D.I. 225 in 19-cv-1727-RGA; D.I. 11 in 21-cv-1065-RGA; D.I. 13 in 21-cv-1066-RGA; D.I. 12 in 21-cv-1063-RGA) Stipulation and Proposed Order to Consolidate and Extend Time (*Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 12/3/2021, Pretrial Order due by 10/11/2022, Status letter due by 7/6/2022, A Bench Trial is set to start 11/7/2022, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A) (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/30/2021. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01727-RGA et al.(nms)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Consolidate and Extend Time, by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 8/30/2021 (nms).
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' first set of joint requests for production '179 and '291 Patents (Nos. 1-11) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 223 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Greg J. Winter as co-counsel. Reason for request: Left Firm. (Gattuso, Dominick)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 SO ORDERED Granting (D.I. 218 in 19-cv-1727-RGA; 74 in D.I. 19-cv-1674-RGA) Stipulation and Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/16/2021. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01674-RGA, 1:19-cv-01727-RGA(nms)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 221 SO ORDERED Granting #219 Stipulation and Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/16/2021. (nms)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORAL ORDER: The conference scheduled for 8/20/2021, is CANCELED. The parties have advised that the dispute has been resolved. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/12/2021. (nms)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 219 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 218 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC, Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Janssen Pharmaceutica NV. (Tigan, Jeremy)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 217 SO ORDERED Granting #216 Authenticity Stipulation and Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/10/2021. (nms)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Authenticity Stipulation and [Proposed] Order, by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 8/10/2021 (nms).
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Fifth Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (No.7) filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Second Set of Request for Admissions to Plaintiffs (Nos. 3-5) and (2) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 4-6) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 213 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendant Alkem Laboratories Limited's First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-6) and (2) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendant Alkem Laboratories Limited's Second Set of Individual Interrogatories (Nos. 4-7) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 212 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s First Set of Requests for Admissions (Nos. 1-2) and (2) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Third Interrogatory to Plaintiff (No. 3) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 9) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 SO ORDERED Granting #209 Authenticity Stipulation and Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/21/2021. (nms)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Authenticity Stipulation and [Proposed] Order between Plaintiffs and Hetero Labs Limited and Hetero USA Inc., by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 7/21/2021 (nms).
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #208 STIPULATION and Proposed Order (see Stipulation for details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/21/2021. (nms)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 STIPULATION and Proposed Order - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 7/21/2021 (nms).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a discovery conference on 8/20/2021, at 2:00 PM. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. The conference will be held using Teams. A joint email with the email addresses for all those participating in the conference shall be due to the Court's Case Manager by 4:00 PM on 8/10/2021. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/20/2021. (nms)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Alkem Laboratories Limited's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(1) and [CONFIDENTIAL] Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 205 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Objections and Response to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants (No. 9) filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Swadley, Beth)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Third Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 9) filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 9) [CONFIDENTIAL] filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 SO ORDERED Granting #201 Authenticity Stipulation and Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/16/2021. (nms)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Authenticity Stipulation and [Proposed] Order, by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 7/16/2021 (nms).
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Hetero's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 9) filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Alkem Laboratories Limited's [CONFIDENTIAL] Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Common Interrogatories to Alkem (No. 9) filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Notice of the Deposition of Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Swadley, Beth)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 SO ORDERED Granting #196 Stipulation and Order to not exchange privilege logs. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/8/2021. (nms)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to not exchange privilege logs by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Joint Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-7) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Second Interrogatory to Plaintiffs (No. 2) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Final Invalidity Contentions filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kerri Kaplan, Kathleen Waldron and Tim Costello filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Second Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 3-5) [CONFIDENTIAL]; and, (ii) Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 4- 6) filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alkem Laboratories Limited's Second Set of Individual Interrogatories (Nos. 4-7) and Alkem Laboratories Limited's [CONFIDENTIAL - SUBJECT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER] First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-6) filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.s Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs Interrogatories (Nos. 3, 4, 6, and 7) filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Third Interrogatory to Plaintiffs (No. 3); and, (ii) Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-2) [CONFIDENTIAL] filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants (No. 8); and 2) Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. (Nos. 1-2) filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Swadley, Beth)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Alkem Laboratories Limited's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants (No. 9) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. #178 has been replaced with a corrected version per counsel's request. The NEF for the filing has been regenerated. (nms)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. #182 has been replaced per counsel's request. A notice intended for another matter was inadvertently uploaded in the first instance. The NEF for the filing has been regenerated. (nms)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.s Objections and Response to Plaintiffs Notice of the Deposition of Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6), (2) Defendants MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc.s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Second Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 8), and (3) Defendants MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc.s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-2) filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Main Document 182 replaced on 6/15/2021) (nms).
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Plaintiffs filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-2) and; (2) Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 8) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories; and, (ii) Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 8) [CONFIDENTIAL] filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick) (Main Document 178 replaced on 6/15/2021) (nms). (Main Document 178 replaced on 6/15/2021) (nms).
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Hetero's objections and responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 8) filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Hetero's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Alkem Laboratories Limited's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Alkem (No. 8) and Defendant Alkem Laboratories Limited's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Alkem (Nos. 1-2) filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ronald M. Daignault,Richard Juang for MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 3-7) [CONFIDENTIAL] filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Joint Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-7) [CONFIDENTIAL] filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, and Eden Biodesign, LLC on at a time and place to be mutually agreed upon by counsel filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Notice to Hetero Labs Limited and Hetero USA Inc. of Depositions Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(1) and (2) Plaintiffs' Notice of the Deposition of Hetero Labs Limited and Hetero USA, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Notice of the Deposition of Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) and (2) Plaintiffs' Notice to Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. of Depositions Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(1) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Notice of the Deposition of Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) and (2) Plaintiffs' Notice to Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited of Depositions Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(1) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Notice to Alkem Laboratories Limited of Depositions Pursuant to Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(1) and (2) Plaintiffs' Notice of the Deposition of Alkem Laboratories Limited Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Notice to MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc. of Depositions Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(1) and (2) Plaintiffs' Notice of the Deposition of MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Notice to Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. of Depositions Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(1) and (2) Plaintiffs' Notice of the Deposition of Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kevin J. Boyle for Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited and for Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01479-RGA, 1:19-cv-01727-RGA(mal)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 NOTICE OF SERVICE of supplemental responses to subset (Nos. 5-7) of First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin J. Boyle of Winston & Strawn LLP - filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.. (Gattuso, Dominick)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (D.I. 164 in 19-cv-1727-RGA; D.I. 39 in 20-cv-1479-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin J. Boyle of Winston & Strawn LLP, filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/21/2021. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01727-RGA, 1:20-cv-01479-RGA(nms)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants and Supplemental Objections and Responses to Alkem's Interrogatory Nos. 1-2 filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants (No. 8) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Alkem Laboratories Limited's [CONFIDENTIAL] Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Alkem (Nos. 6-7) filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industry Ltd.'s Second Interrogatory to Plaintiff (No. 2) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kenneth Laurence Dorsney (Dorsney, Kenneth)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants Hetero Labs Limited and Hetero USA, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (No. 1) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Janssen Pharmaceutica NV, Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Janssen Pharmaceutica NV (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 SO ORDERED as modified re (D.I. 31 in 20-cv-1479-RGA; D.I. 36 in 20-cv-1344-RGA; D.I. 152 in 19-cv-1727-RGA) Stipulation and Proposed Order to Modify Case Schedules. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/5/2021. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01674-RGA, 1:19-cv-01727-RGA, 1:20-cv-01344-RGA, 1:20-cv-01479-RGA(nms)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (154 in 19-cv-1727-RGA; 33 in 20-cv-1479-RGA; 38 in 20-cv-1344-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Hassen Sayeed, Daniel O'Boyle, Carolyn Wall, James Yi Li and Mark A. Hayden of O'Melveny & Myers LLP, filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica NV, Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/5/2021. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01727-RGA, 1:20-cv-01344-RGA, 1:20-cv-01479-RGA(nms)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance of Lisa B. Pensabene of O'Melveny & Myers LLP by Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Janssen Pharmaceutica NV (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Hassen Sayeed, Daniel O'Boyle, Carolyn Wall, James Yi Li and Mark A. Hayden of O'Melveny & Myers LLP - filed by Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Allergan USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica NV. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Amanda K. Antons as co-counsel. Reason for request: No Longer with Firm. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Modify Case Schedules by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Janssen Pharmaceutica NV, Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Janssen Pharmaceutica NV. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Second Interrogatory to Plaintiffs (No. 2) filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Hetero's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (No. 1) filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Zachary B. Cohen of Winston & Strawn LLP as co-counsel. Reason for request: Left Firm. (Gattuso, Dominick)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE of of Change of Law Firm Affiliation by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Invalidity Contentions for U.S. Patent No. 9,675,587 filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Swadley, Beth)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company and Eden Biodesign, LLC's Objections and Responses to Defendant Alkem Laboratories Limited's First Set of Individual Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (D.I. 56 in 19-cv-1674-RGA; D.I. 143 in 19-cv-1727-RGA) STIPULATION for Extension of Time between Plaintiffs and Aurobindo to substantially complete document production to January 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/13/2021. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01674-RGA, 1:19-cv-01727-RGA(nms)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATION for Extension of Time - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Janssen Pharmaceutica NV. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 1/13/2021 (nms).
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (D.I. 55 in 19-cv-1674-RGA; D.I. 142 in 19-cv-1727-RGA) STIPULATION for Extension of Time for the substantial completion of document production to January 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/12/2021. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01674-RGA, 1:19-cv-01727-RGA(nms)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for the substantial completion of document production to January 12, 2021 (between Plaintiffs and Aurobindo only) - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 1/12/2021 (nms).
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 1-7) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for various terms in U.S. Patent Nos. 8,691,860, 9,115,091, 9,364,489, 9,789,125, 9,675,587, and 10,188,632.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/11/2021. (nms)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to first set of common interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 1- 7) filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Swadley, Beth)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Alkem Laboratories Limited's [CONFIDENTIAL - SUBJECT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER] Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Alkem (Nos. 1-7) filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Official Transcript of Markman Hearing Videoconference held on 12/21/20 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter Heather M. Triozzi,Email: Heather_Triozzi@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/20/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/1/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/30/2021. (Triozzi, Heather)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The Notice of Service filed at D.I. 138 has been removed from the docket per Counsel's request. This filing was duplicative of the notice already on file at D.I. #137 . (nms)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alkem Laboratories Limited's [CONFIDENTIAL - SUBJECT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER] First Set of Individual Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3) filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Markman Hearing held on 12/21/2020. Counsel for Plaintiffs: J. Tigan. Counsel for Defendants: K. Dorsney, J. Phillips, P. Kraman, D. Gattuso, S. Stamoulis. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi.) (lak)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Remark: The public may access the hearing scheduled for 12/21/2020, at 10:00 a.m. by dialing the following phone number: +1 202-503-1666, then enter Conference ID: 153315280#. The dial-in information provides listening capabilities only. (lak)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited's Amended Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures; and, (ii) Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited's Amended Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 1-7) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 SO ORDERED Granting #128 Joint Motion for Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/24/2020. (nms)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 APPENDIX, Volume 2 of 2 re #129 Joint Claim Construction Brief, by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/24/2020 (nms).
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 APPENDIX, Volume 1 of 2 re #129 Joint Claim Construction Brief, by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits R-V)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/24/2020 (nms).
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Joint Claim Construction Brief, filed by Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/24/2020 (nms).
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Joint Motion for Claim Construction - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/24/2020 (nms).
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORAL ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the Markman Hearing set for 12/21/2020, will now begin at 10:00 AM. The hearing is limited to two hours. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/23/2020. (nms)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORAL ORDER: The Markman hearing scheduled for December 21, 2020, will now be held using Skype for business. A joint email with the email addresses for all those participating in the hearing shall be due to the Court's Case Manager by 4:00 PM on 12/14/2020. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/23/2020. (nms)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to substantially complete document production to January 11, 2021 - filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited. (Bilson, David)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #125 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to substantially complete document production to January 11, 2021. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/17/2020. (nms)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The brief filed at D.I. 124 has been rejected. The brief is to be served not filed. (nms)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.s Responses and Objections to the Request for Production served by Defendants Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Alkem Laboratories Limited, Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute Videoconference held on 10/8/20 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter Heather M. Triozzi,Email: Heather_Triozzi@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2021. (Triozzi, Heather)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Response to Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Alkem Laboratories Limited, Hetero Labs Limited and Hetero USA Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Joint Request for the Production of Documents and Things filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER: Plaintiffs' letter seeking dismissal of Defendants' invalidity defenses and counterclaims is DENIED (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/13/2020. (nms)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 10/8/2020. Counsel for Plaintiffs: J. Tigan. Counsel for Defendants: D. Gattuso, P. Kraman. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi.) (lak)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION to serve reply claim construction brief to October 8, 2020, and to serve sur-reply claim construction brief to November 5, 2020 - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/2/2020 (nms).
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #118 S TIPULATION to serve reply claim construction brief to October 8, 2020, and to serve sur-reply claim construction brief to November 5, 2020. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/2/2020. (nms)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Pilar G. Kraman regarding Defendants' Responsive Letter Regarding Invalidity Contentions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraman, Pilar)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Letter to The Honorable Judge Richard G. Andrews from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding Invalidity Contentions. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1-9)(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a discovery conference on 10/8/2020, at 2:00 PM. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. The conference will be held using Skype for business. A joint email with the email addresses for all those participating in the conference shall be due to the Court's Case Manager by 4:00 PM on 10/1/2020. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/17/2020. (nms)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Alkem Laboratories Limited, Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.s Joint Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Alkem Laboratories Limited, Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.s Joint Requests for the Production of Documents and Things filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Response to Sun Pharmaceutical Industry Ltd.'s First Interrogatory to Plaintiffs (No. 1) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amanda K. Antons - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Janssen Pharmaceutica NV. (Tigan, Jeremy)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (D.I. 111 in 19-cv-1727-RGA; D.I. 49 in 19-cv-1674-RGA)MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amanda K. Antons, filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica NV, Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/16/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01674-RGA, 1:19-cv-01727-RGA(nms)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Answering Claim Construction Brief filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE OF SERVICE of response to second set of requests for production (Nos. 12-94) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos.890) filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Swadley, Beth)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Response to Plaintiffs Response to Plaintiffs Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 12-94) filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Second set of Requests for Production filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Alkem Laboratories Limited's [CONFIDENTIAL] Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 10-92) filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.s First Interrogatory to Plaintiffs (No. 1) filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Hetero's response to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 JOINT Claim Construction Chart, by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6, #2 Exhibit 7-16, #3 Exhibit 17-25, #4 Exhibit 26-30, #5 Exhibit 31)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 7/23/2020 (nms).
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 SO ORDERED Granting #99 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/21/2020. (nms)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 PROPOSED Stipulated Protective Order, by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Kraman, Pilar) Modified on 7/21/2020 (nms).
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File Joint Claim Construction Chart to July 22, 2020 - filed by Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Allergan USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica NV. (Tigan, Jeremy)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM ORDER: I adopt Defendants' position regarding a dispute about the protective order. A proposed protective order is to be resubmitted in conformity with that ruling. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/20/2020. (nms)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (98 in 19-cv-1727-RGA; 42 in 19-cv-1674-RGA) Stipulation and Order to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/20/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01674-RGA, 1:19-cv-01727-RGA(nms)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Joint Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding Protective Order Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F and 1-6)(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Gregory J. Winter for Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Defendants filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Claim Construction Issue Identification filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Joint Claim Terms for Construction and Proposed Constructions filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.s Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory J. Winter - filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. (Gattuso, Dominick)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #91 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory J. Winter, filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/26/2020. (nms)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #90 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Parties to Submit a Proposed Protective Order to June 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/22/2020. (nms)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Parties to Submit a Proposed Protective Order to June 26, 2020 - filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. (Gattuso, Dominick)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Joint Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-58) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time to submit Proposed Protective Order to June 19, 2020 - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Janssen Pharmaceutica NV. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 6/5/2020 (nms).
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (36 in 19-cv-1674-RGA; 88 in 19-cv-01727-RGA) STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time to submit Proposeed Protective Order to June 19, 2020. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/5/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01674-RGA, 1:19-cv-01727-RGA(nms)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Claim Charts Relating Each Accused Product to the Asserted Claims (served on various defendants as outlined in notice) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit a Proposed Protective Order to June 5, 2020 - filed by Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Allergan USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica NV. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (86 in 19-cv-1727-RGA; 34 in 19-cv-1674-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit a Proposed Protective Order to June 5, 2020. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/22/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01674-RGA, 1:19-cv-01727-RGA(nms)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AbbVie Inc. for Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Proposed Protective Order to May 22, 2020 - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Janssen Pharmaceutica NV. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (32 in 19-cv-1674-RGA; 84 in 19-cv-1727-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Proposed Protective Order to May 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/11/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01674-RGA, 1:19-cv-01727-RGA(nms)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Timothy H. Kratz and George J. Barry, III for Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #83 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George J. Barry III, filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/6/2020. (nms)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George J. Barry III - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Joint Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-58) filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (30 in 19-cv-1674-RGA; 81 in 19-cv-1727-RGA) STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/27/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01674-RGA, 1:19-cv-01727-RGA(nms)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time - filed by Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Allergan USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica NV. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 4/27/2020 (nms).
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-11) filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (79 in 19-cv-1727-RGA; 29 in 19-cv-1674-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed protective order to May 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/13/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01674-RGA, 1:19-cv-01727-RGA(nms)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed protective order to May 11, 2020 - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Janssen Pharmaceutica NV. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kenneth S. Canfield for Hetero Labs Limited and Hetero USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #78 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth S. Canfield, filed by Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/9/2020. (nms)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth S. Canfield - filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pro hac motion filed at D.I. 78 has been removed from the docket per counsel's request as it contained errors. The entry granting the motion has also been removed. Counsel will file a corrected motion. (nms)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel Jeffrey J. Lyons, by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Janssen Pharmaceutica NV. (Lyons, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/27/2020 (nms).
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Hetero's core technical documents filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.s Production of Core Technical Documents Pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's Core Technical Documents filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Alkem Laboratories Limited's Production of Core Technical Documents Pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Sky C. Adams of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP as co-counsel. Reason for request: No Longer with Firm. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (25 in 19-cv-1674-RGA; 70 in 19-cv-1727-RGA) STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/11/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01674-RGA, 1:19-cv-01727-RGA(nms)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Janssen Pharmaceutica NV. (Lyons, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/12/2020 (nms).
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-7) filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Swadley, Beth)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-11) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Alkem Laboratories Limited's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-9) filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Hetero's response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-12) filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (65 in 19-cv-1727-RGA; 24 in 19-cv-1674-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed protective order to March 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/27/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01674-RGA, 1:19-cv-01727-RGA(nms)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed protective order to March 11, 2020 - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Janssen Pharmaceutica NV. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial ESI Disclosures filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Swadley, Beth)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Paragraph 4(a) Disclosures filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery of Defendant Alkem Laboratories Limited filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (57 in 19-cv-1727-RGA; 20 in 19-cv-1674-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed protective order to February 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/13/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01674-RGA, 1:19-cv-01727-RGA(nms)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed protective order to February 26, 2020 - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Janssen Pharmaceutica NV. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (56 in 19-cv-1727-RGA; 19 in 19-cv-1674-RGA) STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/10/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01674-RGA, 1:19-cv-01727-RGA(nms)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION and Order for Extension of Time - filed by Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited, Allergan USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica NV. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/10/2020 (nms).
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Defendants filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Kraman, Pilar)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Setting Teleconference: As a result of the teleconference of 2/3/20, serial teleconferences are scheduled involving plaintiffs counsel and defense counsel with the Court on Monday, February 8, 2021. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Defense counsel for the particular defendant shall initiate the teleconference call. The purpose of these serial teleconferences is to discuss the parties interest in mediation and its timing. If any party wishes to discuss/explore with this Judge mediation at an earlier time frame, it may do so by private, confidential communication with Chambers, including by email to the Court, with a copy to Cathleen Kennedy, Judicial Administrator. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge. (cak)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltds Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Defendant Alkem Laboratories Limited Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited.(Bilson, David)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Hetero's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures and Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiffs' counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 2/3/2020 at 11:30 AM Eastern Time with Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/13/20. (cak)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 3/12/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 3/12/2021. Fact Discover completed by 5/14/2021. A Status Conference is set for 1/7/2022, at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 11/23/2020. A Markman Hearing is set for 12/21/2020, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Pretrial Conference is set for 4/15/2022, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Bench Trial is set for 5/2/2022, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/10/2020.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/10/2020. (nms)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrderforADR-Mediation.pdf (cak)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Scheduling Conference held on 1/10/2020. Local counsel present for plaintiffs: J. Tigan. Local counsel present for defendants: K. Dorsney, P. Kraman, D. Gattuso, D. Bilson, S. Stamoulis. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi.) (crb)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Proposed Scheduling Orders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #43 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald M. Daignault and Richard Juang, filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/8/2020. (nms)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald M. Daignault and Richard Juang - filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #42 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter J. Armenio, Colleen Tracy James, Sky C. Adams and Allyson E. Parks, filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica NV, Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/6/2020. (nms)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter J. Armenio, Colleen Tracy James, Sky C. Adams and Allyson E. Parks - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC., Janssen Pharmaceutica NV. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrea Cheek - filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Bilson, David) Modified on 1/3/2020 (nms).
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrea Cheek, filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/3/2020. (nms)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrea L. Cheek for Alkem Laboratories Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ANSWER to #33 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy H. Kratz, filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/27/2019. (nms)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ANSWER to #29 Answer to Complaint, and Counterclaim, by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 12/27/2019 (nms).
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ANSWER to #27 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC..(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 12/27/2019 (nms).
December 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy H. Kratz - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Carol M. Pitzel Cruz for Alkem Laboratories Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Carol Pitzel Cruz - filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Carol Pitzel Cruz)(Bilson, David)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew E. Morrell, Justin E. Culbertson, and William R. Zimmerman for Alkem Laboratories Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #36 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Carol Pitzel Cruz, filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/17/2019. (nms)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William R. Zimmerman, Andrew E. Morrell and Justin E. Culbertson - filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certification of William R. Zimmerman, #2 Certification of Andrew E. Morrell, #3 Certification of Justin E. Culbertson)(Bilson, David)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited. (Phillips, John)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIMS against All Plaintiffs by Alkem Laboratories Limited.(Phillips, John) Modified on 12/16/2019 (nms).
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #35 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William R. Zimmerman, Andrew E. Morrell and Justin E. Culbertson, filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/16/2019. (nms)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 1/10/2020, at 11:45 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/12/2019. (nms)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael J. Gaertner, David B. Abramowitz, Carolyn A. Blessing, Emily L. Savas, and Jonathan B. Turpin for Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Gaertner, David B. Abramowitz, Carolyn A. Blessing, Emily L. Savas, and Jonathan B. Turpin, filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/6/2019. (nms)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Gaertner, David B. Abramowitz, Carolyn A. Blessing, Emily L. Savas, and Jonathan B. Turpin - filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Kraman, Pilar)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIMS against All Plaintiffs, by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 12/3/2019 (nms).
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. (Gattuso, Dominick)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defendants and, COUNTERCLAIMS against All Plaintiffs, by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited.(Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 12/3/2019 (nms).
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Cadila Healthcare Limited for Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Kraman, Pilar)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Kraman, Pilar)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Aurobindo Pharma Limited for Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Dmitry V. Shelhoff and Edward D. Pergament for Hetero Labs Limited and Hetero USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Hetero Labs Ltd., Corporate Parent Hetero Drugs Ltd. for Hetero USA Inc. filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dmitry V. Shelhoff and Attorney Edward D. Pergament - filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dmitry V. Shelhoff and Attorney Edward D. Pergament, filed by Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/18/2019. (nms)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Charles B. Klein for Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Zachary B. Cohen and Jovial Wong for Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles B. Klein, Jovial Wong and Zachary B. Cohen - filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. (Gattuso, Dominick)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORAL ORDER: The Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance (D.I. #17 ) is DENIED without prejudice to renew. The motion or certification needs to address the annual filing fee due. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/9/2019. (nms)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles B. Klein, Jovial Wong and Zachary B. Cohen, filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/9/2019. (nms)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles B. Klein, Jovial Wong, and Zachary B. Cohen of Winston & Strawn LLP - filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited. (Gattuso, Dominick)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc.: For Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. waiver sent on 9/20/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to December 2, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited answer due 12/2/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/7/2019. (nms)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to December 2, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. answer due 12/2/2019; Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. answer due 12/2/2019; Hetero Labs Limited answer due 12/2/2019; Hetero USA Inc. answer due 12/2/2019; MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 12/2/2019; Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. answer due 12/2/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/7/2019. (nms)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to December 2, 2019 - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to December 2, 2019 - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc.: For MSN Laboratories Private Limited waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc.: For Hetero Labs Limited waiver sent on 9/26/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Tigan, Jeremy)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc.: For Alkem Laboratories Limited waiver sent on 9/24/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Related Papers served on Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. on September 17, 2019, filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc.. Hetero USA Inc. served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc.. MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc.. Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eden Biodesign, LLC., Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc.. Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Alkem Laboratories Limited on 9/16/2019; Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. on 9/16/2019; Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. on 9/16/2019; Hetero Labs Limited on 9/16/2019; Hetero USA Inc. on 9/16/2019; MSN Laboratories Private Limited on 9/16/2019; MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 9/16/2019; Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited on 9/16/2019; Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. on 9/16/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sam)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Allergan plc for Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC. (sam)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,691,860; 9,115,091; 9,364,489; 9,675,587; 9,789,125; 10,188,632 (sam)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: On or after 07/31/2019. Date of Expiration of Patent: SEE ATTACHED.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: On or after 11/27/2022. (sam)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Alkem Laboratories Limited, Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Eden Biodesign, LLC., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2730816.) - filed by Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company, Allergan USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allergan USA, Inc., et al. v. MSN Laboratories Private Limited, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Allergan Holdings Unlimited Company
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: MSN Laboratories Private Limited
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Richard Juang
Represented By: Ronald M. Daignault
Represented By: Richard Charles Weinblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Alkem Laboratories Limited
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea L. Cheek
Represented By: Andrew E. Morrell
Represented By: Carol M. Pitzel Cruz
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: Justin E. Culbertson
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Richard Juang
Represented By: Ronald M. Daignault
Represented By: Richard Charles Weinblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eden Biodesign, LLC.
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eden Biodesign, LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited
Represented By: Zachary B. Cohen
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Represented By: Jovial Wong
Represented By: Charles B. Klein
Represented By: Gregory J. Winter
Represented By: Kevin J. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero USA Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Edward D. Pergament
Represented By: Dmitry V. Shelhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.
Represented By: George J. Barry, III
Represented By: Timothy H. Kratz
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: R. Touhey Myer
Represented By: Michael P. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.
Represented By: George J. Barry, III
Represented By: Timothy H. Kratz
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: R. Touhey Myer
Represented By: Michael P. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs Limited
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Edward D. Pergament
Represented By: Dmitry V. Shelhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Gaertner
Represented By: Pilar Gabrielle Kraman
Represented By: Carolyn A. Blessing
Represented By: David B. Abramowitz
Represented By: Jonathan B. Turpin
Represented By: Emily L. Savas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?