PERFECT REMEDY, INC. v. VERITIV OPERATING COMPANY
Plaintiff: PERFECT REMEDY, INC.
Defendant: VERITIV OPERATING COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv01751
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 10/18/2019. (myr)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 Record of case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number in Other District: 3:19-cv-14380. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
September 18, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jjc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/18/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Transfer Case to the UNITED STATES DISTRICT for DISCTRICT OF DELAWARE. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/11/2019. (jdb) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/18/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Charles Quinn re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware . (QUINN, CHARLES) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/18/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Counterclaim by PERFECT REMEDY, INC..(QUINN, CHARLES) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/18/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by VERITIV OPERATING COMPANY re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware (WHITMER, FREDERICK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/18/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT in Support filed by VERITIV OPERATING COMPANY re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware (Frederick L. Whitmer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(WHITMER, FREDERICK)[Transferred from New Jersey on 9/18/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware by VERITIV OPERATING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WHITMER, FREDERICK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/18/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against PERFECT REMEDY, INC. by VERITIV OPERATING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(WHITMER, FREDERICK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/18/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VERITIV OPERATING COMPANY identifying Veritiv Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (WHITMER, FREDERICK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/18/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VERITIV OPERATING COMPANY from Superior Court of New Jersey, Somerset County, case number SOM-L-000736-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9776244), filed by VERITIV OPERATING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(WHITMER, FREDERICK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERFECT REMEDY, INC. v. VERITIV OPERATING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PERFECT REMEDY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERITIV OPERATING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?