Blix Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Blix Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01869
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey E. Timlin on behalf of Apple Inc. (Timlin, Tracey)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bindu Ann George Palapura on behalf of Apple Inc. (Palapura, Bindu)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint to December 20, 2019, and for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint to February 12, 2020 filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/25/19. (ntl)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint, and for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint to December 20, 2019, and February 12, 2020 - filed by Apple Inc.. (Moore, David)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise plead in response to the complaint to November 25, 2019 filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/29/19. (ntl)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise plead in response to the complaint to November 25, 2019 - filed by Apple Inc.. (Moore, David)
October 17, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Adam B. Wolfson,Steven C. Cherny,and Patrick Curran for Blix Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam Wolfson filed by Blix Inc., #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven C. Cherny and Patrick D. Curran filed by Blix Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/15/19. (ntl)
October 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam Wolfson - filed by Blix Inc.. (Fry, David)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven C. Cherny and Patrick D. Curran - filed by Blix Inc.. (Fry, David)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blix Inc.. Apple Inc. served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Fry, David)
October 4, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Apple Inc. on 10/4/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (mal)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Blix Inc.. (mal)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,749,484 B2. (mal)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2747344.) - filed by Blix Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blix Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blix Inc.
Represented By: David M. Fry
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?