McCurdy v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James McCurdy
Defendant: Wright Medical Group, Inc. and Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01898
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiff's Answering Brief and Defendants' Reply Brief to December 13, 2019 and December 23, 2019, respectively - filed by James McCurdy. (Hrubiec, R.)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiff's Answering Brief and Defendants' Reply Brief to December 13, 2019 and December 23, 2019, respectively filed by James McCurdy. Set Briefing Schedule: re #6 MOTION to to Dismiss and Motion to Strike pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(f). (Answering Brief due 12/13/2019., Reply Brief due 12/23/2019.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/2/2019. (fms)
November 26, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Dana Ash for Wright Medical Group, Inc. and for Wright Medical Technology, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d), Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
November 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Anne A. Gruner for Wright Medical Group, Inc. and Wright Medical Technology, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anne A. Gruner - filed by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Nwaeze, Oderah)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dana J. Ash - filed by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Nwaeze, Oderah)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anne A. Gruner filed by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc., #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dana J. Ash filed by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/21/2019. (fms)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Wright Medical Group, N.V. for Wright Medical Group, Inc.; Corporate Parent Wright Medical Group, Inc. for Wright Medical Technology, Inc. filed by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Nwaeze, Oderah)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(f) re #1 Complaint, filed by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nwaeze, Oderah)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(f) re #1 Complaint, - filed by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Nwaeze, Oderah)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Oderah C. Nwaeze on behalf of Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Nwaeze, Oderah)
November 14, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The summonses filed at D.I. Nos. #3 and #4 under the NOTICE OF SERVICE docket code have been docketed by the docket clerk using the SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED docket code found under INITIAL PLEADINGS AND SERVICE, SERVICE OF PROCESS. (fms)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James McCurdy. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (fms)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James McCurdy. Wright Medical Group, Inc. served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (fms)
October 11, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Wright Medical Group, Inc. on 10/11/2019; Wright Medical Technology, Inc. on 10/11/2019. (kmd)
October 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 8, 2019 No Summons Issued. (amf)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Wright Medical Group, Inc. and Wright Medical Technology, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2749434) - filed by James McCurdy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCurdy v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Oderah C. Nwaeze
Represented By: Anne A. Gruner
Represented By: Dana Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Oderah C. Nwaeze
Represented By: Anne A. Gruner
Represented By: Dana Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McCurdy
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?