Henry v. Wilmington Trust, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Marlow Henry
Defendant: E. Stockton Croft, IV, Wilmington Trust, N.A. and Brian C. Sass
Case Number: 1:2019cv01925
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Prame, Sarah M. Adams, and Elizabeth L. Woods filed by Wilmington Trust, N.A. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/5/2019. (dlw)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Prame, Sarah M. Adams, and Elizabeth L. Woods - filed by Wilmington Trust, N.A. (Manwaring, Albert) Modified on 12/5/2019 (dlw).
November 18, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Mark A. Nebrig and Kristen J. Kenley for E. Stockton Croft, IV and Brian C. Sass added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
November 18, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Todd F. Jackson and Daniel M. Feinberg for Marlow Henry added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark A. Nebrig and Kristen J. Kenley filed by Brian C. Sass, E. Stockton Croft, IV. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/14/2019. (dlw)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark A. Nebrig and Kristen J. Kenley - filed by E. Stockton Croft, IV, Brian C. Sass. (Silverstein, Alan)
November 13, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Patrick O. Muench, Ryan T. Jenny, and Gregory Y. Porter for Marlow Henry added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d), Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 20, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: E. Stockton Croft, IV answer due 12/20/2019; Brian C. Sass answer due 12/20/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/12/2019. (dlw)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 20, 2019 - filed by E. Stockton Croft, IV, Brian C. Sass. (Silverstein, Alan)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory Y. Porter, Ryan T. Jenny and Patrick O. Muench filed by Marlow Henry. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/4/2019. (dlw)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory Y. Porter, Ryan T. Jenny and Patrick O. Muench - filed by Marlow Henry. (Felice, David)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel Feinberg and Todd Jackson filed by Marlow Henry. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/4/2019. (dlw)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel Feinberg and Todd Jackson - filed by Marlow Henry. (Felice, David)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to December 20, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Wilmington Trust, N.A. answer due 12/20/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/1/2019. (dlw)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to December 20, 2019 - filed by Wilmington Trust, N.A.. (Manwaring, Albert)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on E. Stockton Croft, IV on 10/23/2019, filed by Marlow Henry. (Felice, David)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Defendant Wilmington Trust, N.A. by its Registered Agent Corporation Service Company on 10/17/2019, filed by Marlow Henry. (Felice, David) Modified on 10/25/2019 (dlw).
October 17, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to E. Stockton Croft, IV on 10/17/2019; Brian C. Sass on 10/17/2019; Wilmington Trust, N.A. on 10/17/2019. (nmg)
October 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 11, 2019 No Summons Issued. (amf)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against E. Stockton Croft, IV, Brian C. Sass, and Wilmington Trust, N.A. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2752627) - filed by Marlow Henry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Wilmington Trust, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Stockton Croft, IV
Represented By: Kristen J. Kenley
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Represented By: Mark A. Nebrig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Kirsten Ann Zeberkiewicz
Represented By: Albert H. Manwaring, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian C. Sass
Represented By: Kristen J. Kenley
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Represented By: Mark A. Nebrig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlow Henry
Represented By: David A. Felice
Represented By: Gregory Y. Porter
Represented By: Ryan T. Jenny
Represented By: Daniel M. Feinberg
Represented By: Patrick O. Muench
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?