Cicchetti v. Transport Serge Beauregard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Linda Cicchetti
Defendant: Transport Serge Beauregard, Cecil F. Hill, Stephane Frappier and Transport Serge Beauregard, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01929
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kathleen G. Burke filed by Linda Cicchetti. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/4/19. (ntl)
December 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kathleen G. Burke - filed by Linda Cicchetti. (Gallagher, Patrick)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Stephane Frappier, Transport Serge Beauregard, Inc..(Sandza, Elizabeth)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY BY TWELVE DEMANDED , CROSSCLAIM against Stephane Frappier, Transport Serge Beauregard, Inc. by Cecil F. Hill.(Greenberg, Robert)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Cecil F. Hill Answers to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories and Defendant Cecil F. Hills Responses to Plaintiffs Request for Production of Documents with exhibit filed by Cecil F. Hill.(Dolan, Sean)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Cecil F. Hill by Transport Serge Beauregard, Inc., Stephane Frappier.(Sandza, Elizabeth)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Service for Plaintiff's Responses to Interrogatories and Request for Production filed by Linda Cicchetti.(Gallagher, Patrick)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Transport St-Isidore Lte for Transport Serge Beauregard, Inc. filed by Transport Serge Beauregard, Inc.. (Sandza, Elizabeth)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint filed by Transport Serge Beauregard, Inc., Stephane Frappier. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/21/19. (ntl)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint - filed by Stephane Frappier, Transport Serge Beauregard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandza, Elizabeth)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean A. Dolan on behalf of Cecil F. Hill (Dolan, Sean)
October 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Transport Serge Beauregard, Inc. (mal)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Superior Court for the State of Delaware, Case Number N19C-07-097 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2753091)- filed by Transport Serge Beauregard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cicchetti v. Transport Serge Beauregard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transport Serge Beauregard
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Sandza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecil F. Hill
Represented By: Robert M. Greenberg
Represented By: Sean A. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephane Frappier
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Sandza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transport Serge Beauregard, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Sandza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Cicchetti
Represented By: Patrick Christopher Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?