Springsteen v. Proctor & Gamble Company et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Springsteen
Defendant: Astra Zeneca Manufacturing Company and Proctor & Gamble Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01931
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting D.I. #5 MOTION for reconsideration and D.I. #4 Order is VACATED (Copy mailed to Plaintiff). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/25/2019. (myr)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION/Request to proceed without prepayment of Court fees - filed by Jerry Springsteen. (lak)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Motion to Proceed IFP. Filing Fee of $350 Assessed. Plaintiff shall submit trust fund account statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form)( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 11/18/2019.) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/17/2019. (amf)
October 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 against Astra Zeneca Manufacturing Company, Proctor & Gamble Company (IFP, No Fee Paid)- filed by Jerry Springsteen. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(myr)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Jerry Springsteen. (myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Springsteen v. Proctor & Gamble Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Springsteen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astra Zeneca Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proctor & Gamble Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?