Levy v. Calder et al
Plaintiff: Adam Levy
Defendant: Howard E. Janzen, Julius Erving, Michael Sicoli, H. Brian Thompson, Chris McKee, Rhodric C. Hackman, Elizabeth Satin, S. Joseph Bruno, Nick Adamo, Theodore B. Smith, III, Daniel Fraser and Richard D. Calder, Jr.
Nominal Defendant: GTT Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01961
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 CASE CLOSED (ntl)
December 10, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Adam Levy as to Voluntary Dismissal (Bennett, Blake)
November 14, 2019 Filing 23 DECLARATION re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #22 Opening Brief in Support, of J. Wesley Earnhardt by Nick Adamo, S. Joseph Bruno, Richard D. Calder, Jr, Julius Erving, Daniel Fraser, GTT Communications, Inc., Rhodric C. Hackman, Howard E. Janzen, Chris McKee, Elizabeth Satin, Michael Sicoli, Theodore B. Smith, III, H. Brian Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Perri, Matthew)
November 14, 2019 Filing 22 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nick Adamo, S. Joseph Bruno, Richard D. Calder, Jr, Julius Erving, Daniel Fraser, GTT Communications, Inc., Rhodric C. Hackman, Howard E. Janzen, Chris McKee, Elizabeth Satin, Michael Sicoli, Theodore B. Smith, III, H. Brian Thompson.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/2/2019. (Perri, Matthew)
November 14, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Nick Adamo, S. Joseph Bruno, Richard D. Calder, Jr, Julius Erving, Daniel Fraser, GTT Communications, Inc., Rhodric C. Hackman, Howard E. Janzen, Chris McKee, Elizabeth Satin, Michael Sicoli, Theodore B. Smith, III, H. Brian Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perri, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason James Rawnsley on behalf of Nick Adamo, S. Joseph Bruno, Richard D. Calder, Jr, Julius Erving, Daniel Fraser, GTT Communications, Inc., Rhodric C. Hackman, Howard E. Janzen, Chris McKee, Elizabeth Satin, Michael Sicoli, Theodore B. Smith, III, H. Brian Thompson (Rawnsley, Jason)
November 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Perri on behalf of Nick Adamo, S. Joseph Bruno, Richard D. Calder, Jr, Julius Erving, Daniel Fraser, GTT Communications, Inc., Rhodric C. Hackman, Howard E. Janzen, Chris McKee, Elizabeth Satin, Michael Sicoli, Theodore B. Smith, III, H. Brian Thompson (Perri, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #17 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Acceptance of Service and Briefing Schedule for a Potential Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/8/19. (ntl)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Wesley Earnhardt, Molly M. Jamison and Brian M. Maida filed by Julius Erving, H. Brian Thompson, Rhodric C. Hackman, Theodore B. Smith, III, Michael Sicoli, Richard D. Calder, Jr., Howard E. Janzen, Nick Adamo, Daniel Fraser, Elizabeth Satin, Chris McKee, GTT Communications, Inc., S. Joseph Bruno. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/7/19. (ntl)
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Wesley Earnhardt, Molly M. Jamison and Brian M. Maida - filed by Nick Adamo, S. Joseph Bruno, Richard D. Calder, Jr, Julius Erving, Daniel Fraser, GTT Communications, Inc., Rhodric C. Hackman, Howard E. Janzen, Chris McKee, Elizabeth Satin, Michael Sicoli, Theodore B. Smith, III, H. Brian Thompson. (Koch, Rudolf)
November 5, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Acceptance of Service and Briefing Schedule for a Potential Motion to Dismiss by Nick Adamo, S. Joseph Bruno, Richard D. Calder, Jr, Julius Erving, Daniel Fraser, GTT Communications, Inc., Rhodric C. Hackman, Howard E. Janzen, Chris McKee, Elizabeth Satin, Michael Sicoli, Theodore B. Smith, III, H. Brian Thompson. (Koch, Rudolf)
November 5, 2019 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Nick Adamo, S. Joseph Bruno, Richard D. Calder, Jr, Julius Erving, Daniel Fraser, GTT Communications, Inc., Rhodric C. Hackman, Howard E. Janzen, Chris McKee, Elizabeth Satin, Michael Sicoli, Theodore B. Smith, III, H. Brian Thompson. (Koch, Rudolf)
October 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adam Levy. Julius Erving served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adam Levy. Elizabeth Satin served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adam Levy. Nick Adamo served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adam Levy. Theodore B. Smith, III served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adam Levy. Howard E. Janzen served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adam Levy. Rhodric C. Hackman served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adam Levy. S. Joseph Bruno served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adam Levy. H. Brian Thompson served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adam Levy. Daniel Fraser served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adam Levy. Michael Sicoli served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adam Levy. Chris McKee served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adam Levy. Richard D. Calder, Jr served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adam Levy. GTT Communications, Inc. served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 Verified Stockholder Derivative COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Nick Adamo, S. Joseph Bruno, Richard D. Calder, Jr, Julius Erving, Daniel Fraser, GTT Communications, Inc., Rhodric C. Hackman, Howard E. Janzen, Chris McKee, Elizabeth Satin, Michael Sicoli, Theodore B. Smith, III, H. Brian Thompson - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2755545.) - filed by Adam Levy. (Attachments: #1 Verification to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)
October 16, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Nick Adamo on 10/16/2019; S. Joseph Bruno on 10/16/2019; Richard D. Calder, Jr on 10/16/2019; Julius Erving on 10/16/2019; Daniel Fraser on 10/16/2019; GTT Communications, Inc. on 10/16/2019; Rhodric C. Hackman on 10/16/2019; Howard E. Janzen on 10/16/2019; Chris McKee on 10/16/2019; Elizabeth Satin on 10/16/2019; Michael Sicoli on 10/16/2019; Theodore B. Smith, III on 10/16/2019; H. Brian Thompson on 10/16/2019. (kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levy v. Calder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard E. Janzen
Represented By: Matthew Perri
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julius Erving
Represented By: Matthew Perri
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sicoli
Represented By: Matthew Perri
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Brian Thompson
Represented By: Matthew Perri
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris McKee
Represented By: Matthew Perri
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodric C. Hackman
Represented By: Matthew Perri
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Satin
Represented By: Matthew Perri
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Joseph Bruno
Represented By: Matthew Perri
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Adamo
Represented By: Matthew Perri
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore B. Smith, III
Represented By: Matthew Perri
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Fraser
Represented By: Matthew Perri
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. Calder, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Perri
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Levy
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: GTT Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Perri
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?