Clark v. SUPT. S.C.I. Retreat et al
Petitioner: Luis M. Clark
Respondent: SUPT. S.C.I. Retreat and Attorney General of the State of Delaware
Case Number: 1:2019cv01976
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 AEDPA Election Form filed by petitioner and requesting to rule on 2254 as currently pending. (lak)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER notifying petitioner that AEDPA applies to petition and petitioner must file attached election form with the court. (Copy to pet. AEDPA Form) Notice of Compliance deadline set for 11/29/2019. Failure to timely return the completed election form will result in the Court's ruling on your pending Petition as filed. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/30/2019. (myr)
October 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Luis M. Clark. (lak)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5, receipt number DEX032542.) - filed by Luis M. Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. SUPT. S.C.I. Retreat et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SUPT. S.C.I. Retreat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luis M. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?