Scalia v. Coastal Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Defendant: Coastal Services, LLC and George Elliot
Case Number: 1:2019cv02002
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Eugene Scalia against Coastal Services, LLC, George Elliot. SEE CONSENT JUDGMENT FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/31/2019. (dlw)
October 30, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment - filed by Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Luby, Andrea)
October 23, 2019 No Summons Issued. (kmd)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Coastal Services, LLC, George Elliot - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scalia v. Coastal Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Elliot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: Andrea C. Luby
Represented By: Adam F. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?