Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation v. Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Defendant: MSN Laboratories Private Limited, Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Hetero USA Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Novugen Pharma (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd., Hetero Labs Limited Unit III, MSN Life Sciences Private Limited, Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02053
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Dmitry V. Shelhoff for Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit III,and Hetero USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dmitry V. Shelhoff. Ph.D. filed by Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit III. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/20/19. (ntl)
December 19, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dmitry V. Shelhoff. Ph.D. - filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit III, Hetero USA Inc.. (Ormerod, Eve)
December 19, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Eve H. Ormerod on behalf of Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit III, Hetero USA Inc. (Ormerod, Eve)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #20 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 6, 2020 filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/19/19. (ntl)
December 18, 2019 Filing 20 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 6, 2020 - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For Novugen Pharma (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd. waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For Mylan Laboratories Limited waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For Mylan Inc. waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For MSN Life Sciences Private Limited waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For MSN Laboratories Private Limited waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For Hetero USA Inc. waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For Hetero Labs Limited waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For Hetero Labs Limited Unit III waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd. waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation: For Cadila Healthcare Ltd. waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
November 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 29, 2019 No Summons Issued. (nmg)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (nmg)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,101,659; 8,796,331; 8,877,938; 9,388,134. (nmg)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: See Attached. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 7/7/2023. (nmg)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit III, Hetero USA Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Life Sciences Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Novugen Pharma (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2766453.) - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation v. Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSN Laboratories Private Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero USA Inc.
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Dmitry V. Shelhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Laboratories Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs Limited
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Dmitry V. Shelhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novugen Pharma (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs Limited Unit III
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Dmitry V. Shelhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSN Life Sciences Private Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadila Healthcare Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?