Monterey Research, LLC v. Qualcomm Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Monterey Research, LLC
Defendant: Qualcomm Incorporated, Qualcomm CDMA Technologies Asia-Pacific Pte Ltd. and Qualcomm Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02083
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 24, 2020 filed by Qualcomm CDMA Technologies Asia-Pacific Pte Ltd., Qualcomm Technologies, Inc., Qualcomm Incorporated. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Qualcomm CDMA Technologies Asia-Pacific Pte Ltd. answer due 1/24/2020; Qualcomm Incorporated answer due 1/24/2020; Qualcomm Technologies, Inc. answer due 1/24/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/20/2019. (fms)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 24, 2020 - filed by Qualcomm CDMA Technologies Asia-Pacific Pte Ltd., Qualcomm Incorporated, Qualcomm Technologies, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 Postal Receipt(s) for the mailing of process to Qualcomm CDMA Technologies Asia-Pacific Pte Ltd. (sam)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Rosemary J. Piergiovanni re #7 Praecipe filed by Monterey Research, LLC. (Piergiovanni, Rosemary)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 PRAECIPE filed by Rosemary Jean Piergiovanni on behalf of Monterey Research, LLC requesting Clerk to issue Rule 4(f)(2)(C)(ii) service on Qualcomm CDMA Technologies Asia-Pacific Pte Ltd. (Piergiovanni, Rosemary)
November 14, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Qualcomm CDMA Technologies Asia-Pacific Pte Ltd. on 11/14/2019. (mal)
November 13, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael Wueste,Jonas R. McDavit,Ryan G. Thorne,Edward B. Geist,Jordan N. Malz for Monterey Research, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonas R. McDavit, Jordan N. Malz, Edward Geist, Michael Wueste, and Ryan G. Thorne filed by Monterey Research, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/12/2019. (fms)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonas R. McDavit, Jordan N. Malz, Edward Geist, Michael Wueste, and Ryan G. Thorne - filed by Monterey Research, LLC. (Farnan, Brian)
November 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02083-CFC, 1:19-cv-02090-CFC (rjb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monterey Research, LLC. Qualcomm Incorporated served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019; Qualcomm Technologies, Inc. served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Farnan, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent IPValue Management, Inc. for Monterey Research, LLC filed by Monterey Research, LLC. (Farnan, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Qualcomm Incorporated and Qualcomm Technologies, Inc. on 11/4/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (mal)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) see attached. (mal)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Qualcomm CDMA Technologies Asia-Pacific Pte Ltd., Qualcomm Incorporated, Qualcomm Technologies, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2769811.) - filed by Monterey Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monterey Research, LLC v. Qualcomm Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm Incorporated
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm CDMA Technologies Asia-Pacific Pte Ltd.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monterey Research, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Ryan G. Thorne
Represented By: Edward B. Geist
Represented By: Rosemary Jean Piergiovanni
Represented By: Michael Wueste
Represented By: Jonas R. McDavit
Represented By: Jordan N. Malz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?