Zimmer US, Inc. et al v. Conformis, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zimmer US, Inc. and Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
Defendant: Conformis, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02093
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:183
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move against, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 13, 2020 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Conformis, Inc. answer due 1/13/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/16/2019. (nms)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move against, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 13, 2020 - filed by Conformis, Inc.. (Vrana, Robert)
December 3, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Paul Margulies for Conformis, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
December 2, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Matthew M. Wolf for Conformis, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02093-RGA, 1:19-cv-01528-RGA, 1:19-cv-01618-RGA(kmd)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew M. Wolf and Paul Margulies, filed by Conformis, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/26/2019. (nms)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew M. Wolf and Paul Margulies - filed by Conformis, Inc.. (Pascale, Karen)
November 26, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Naveen Modi, and Chetan R. Bansal for Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, and for Zimmer US, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d), Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
November 25, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Young J. Park for Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, and for Zimmer US, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d), Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move against, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 30, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Conformis, Inc. answer due 12/30/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/22/2019. (nms)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move against, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 30, 2019 - filed by Conformis, Inc.. (Pascale, Karen)
November 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael F. Werno for Zimmer US, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d), Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Naveen Modi, Chetan R. Bansal, Young J. Park and Michael F. Werno, filed by Zimmer US, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/19/2019. (nms)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Naveen Modi, Chetan R. Bansal, Young J. Park and Michael F. Werno - filed by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Zimmer US, Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
November 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zimmer US, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, LLC. Conformis, Inc. served on 11/5/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 5, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Conformis, Inc. on 11/5/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (kmd)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. for Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Zimmer US, Inc. filed by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Zimmer US, Inc. (kmd)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,510,334 B1; 8,486,150 B2; 8,979,936 B2; 9,173,661 B2; 9,795,399 B2. (kmd)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Conformis, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2771280.) - filed by Zimmer US, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-K, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmer US, Inc. et al v. Conformis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zimmer US, Inc.
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Naveen Modi
Represented By: Chetan R. Bansal
Represented By: Michael F. Werno
Represented By: Young J. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Naveen Modi
Represented By: Chetan R. Bansal
Represented By: Young J. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conformis, Inc.
Represented By: Karen L. Pascale
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Represented By: Matthew M. Wolf
Represented By: Paul Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?