Eckoldt v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Kimberly Eckoldt
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02117
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Grivner, Karen)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to January 9, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 1/9/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/5/2019. (dlw)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to January 9, 2020 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Eckoldt. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
November 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 12, 2019 Remark: Summons mailed to Philadelphia office per filing party's request. (myr)
November 12, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Equifax Information Services, LLC on 11/12/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2775473.) - filed by Kimberly Eckoldt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eckoldt v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Eckoldt
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?