Mithril GP Employee Feeder LLC v. Crystal Scripps McKellar
Plaintiff: Mithril GP Employee Feeder LLC
Defendant: Crystal Scripps McKellar
Case Number: 1:2019cv02144
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 26 REDACTED VERSION of #24 Exhibits A-F, by Mithril GP Employee Feeder LLC. (Kirshenbaum, Daniel) Modified on 1/13/2020 (nms).
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting #21 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/7/2020. (nms)
January 6, 2020 Filing 24 [SEALED] EXHIBITS A-F re #23 Declaration, by Mithril GP Employee Feeder LLC. (Kirshenbaum, Daniel) Modified on 1/7/2020 (nms).
January 6, 2020 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Ajay Royan re #22 Reply, by Mithril GP Employee Feeder LLC. (Kirshenbaum, Daniel) Modified on 1/7/2020 (nms).
January 6, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY re #12 MOTION to Remand, filed by Mithril GP Employee Feeder LLC. (Kirshenbaum, Daniel) Modified on 1/7/2020 (nms).
January 6, 2020 Filing 21 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - filed by Mithril GP Employee Feeder LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kirshenbaum, Daniel) Modified on 1/7/2020 (nms).
January 6, 2020 Filing 20 REDACTED VERSION of #19 Response to Motion, by Crystal Scripps McKellar. (Walsh, Peter) Modified on 1/6/2020 (nms).
December 30, 2019 Filing 19 [SEALED] RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Remand and Request for Jurisdictional Discovery, filed by Crystal Scripps McKellar. (Walsh, Peter) Modified on 1/2/2020 (nms).
December 23, 2019 Filing 18 REDACTED VERSION of #13 Exhibit 2, by Mithril GP Employee Feeder LLC. (Kirshenbaum, Daniel) Modified on 12/27/2019 (nms).
December 23, 2019 Filing 17 REDACTED VERSION of #14 Declaration of Ajay Royan, by Mithril GP Employee Feeder LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A, C, E, G, I and K)(Kirshenbaum, Daniel) Modified on 12/27/2019 (nms).
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/17/2019. (nms)
December 16, 2019 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #12 MOTION to Remand. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/30/2019. (nms)
December 16, 2019 Filing 15 EXHIBITS B, D, F, H, J, L re #14 Declaration, by Mithril GP Employee Feeder LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit J, #5 Exhibit L)(Kirshenbaum, Daniel) Modified on 12/16/2019 (nms).
December 16, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ian S. Shelton, Catherine E. Garza, and David A. Baay for Crystal Scripps McKellar added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
December 16, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The exhibits filed at D.I. 15 has been removed from the docket as the filing was not formatted properly. The filing lacked a captioned cover page. Counsel shall refile the exhibits accordingly. (nms)
December 16, 2019 Filing 14 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #12 MOTION to Remand, by Mithril GP Employee Feeder LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit K, #7 Certificate of Service)(Kirshenbaum, Daniel) Modified on 12/16/2019 (nms).
December 16, 2019 Filing 13 [SEALED] EXHIBIT 2 to #12 MOTION to Remand, by Mithril GP Employee Feeder LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kirshenbaum, Daniel) Modified on 12/16/2019 (nms).
December 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand - filed by Mithril GP Employee Feeder LLC. (Attachments: #1 7.1.1 Certification, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1)(Kirshenbaum, Daniel) Modified on 12/16/2019 (nms).
December 16, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal - filed by Mithril GP Employee Feeder LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kirshenbaum, Daniel) Modified on 12/16/2019 (nms).
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, by Crystal Scripps McKellar. (Silverstein, Alan) Modified on 12/9/2019 (nms).
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Notice of Removal by Crystal Scripps McKellar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Exhibit D)(Walsh, Peter)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 REDACTED VERSION of #1 MOTION to Seal by Crystal Scripps McKellar. (Walsh, Peter)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Crystal Scripps McKellar answer due 1/17/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/21/2019. (nms)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ian S. Shelton, Catherine E. Garza and David A. Baay, filed by Crystal Scripps McKellar. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/21/2019. (nms)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time by Crystal Scripps McKellar. (Silverstein, Alan)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ian S. Shelton, Catherine E. Garza and David A. Baay - filed by Crystal Scripps McKellar. (Silverstein, Alan)
November 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 18, 2019 Remark : Case submitted for routine judicial case assignment. (rwc)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - granting #1 Motion to Seal Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/18/19. (rwc)
November 15, 2019 Remark: Exit Copies to Duty Judge (LPS). (myr)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to Clerk of Court from Defendant's Counsel, dated 11/15/2019 regarding Motion For Leave to File Notice of Removal Under Seal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 [SEALED] NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Ct of Chancery, Case Number 2019-0835 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 32674)- filed by Crystal Scripps McKellar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Exhibit D)(myr)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 [SEALED] Defendant's MOTION For Leave to File Notice of Removal Under Seal - filed by Crystal Scripps McKellar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mithril GP Employee Feeder LLC v. Crystal Scripps McKellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mithril GP Employee Feeder LLC
Represented By: Martin S. Lessner
Represented By: Daniel Marc Kirshenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Scripps McKellar
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Represented By: Peter J. Walsh, Jr
Represented By: David A. Baay
Represented By: Ian S. Shelton
Represented By: Catherine E. Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?