Nall v. Sussex Correctional Institution et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Nall
Defendant: Sussex Correctional Institution, Louise (Hillman) Bounds, James Bounds, Anne P. Spillane, State of Delaware (Bail Hearing) and Peter H. Niebyl
Case Number: 1:2019cv02187
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against James Bounds, Louise (Hillman) Bounds, Sussex Correctional Institution- filed by Jacob Nall.(mal)
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 Letter to the Clerk of Court from Jacob Nall regarding Defendant to be added to the Complaint. (kmd)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 Letter to the Clerk of Court from Jacob Nall requesting to refile Motion to Compel.(kmd)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiff's motions to consolidate are GRANTED. Civil Action Nos. 19-2187-RGA, 19-2189-RGA, 19-2190-RGA and 19-2191-RGA are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes. Hereafter, court pleadings and documents shall be filed only in Consolidated Civil Action No. 19-2187-RGA. The Court will not accept pleading filed in Civil Action Nos. 19-2189-RGA, 19-2190-RGA, and 19-2191-RGA. Plaintiff's motions to amend complaint are DISMISSED as moot. On or before January 10, 2020, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint in this consolidated action that contains all allegations, claims, and defendants in one pleading. Plaintiff is placed on notice that the failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/18/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02187-RGA, 1:19-cv-02189-RGA, 1:19-cv-02190-RGA, 1:19-cv-02191-RGA(nms)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 Letter to Jacob Nall from Clerk's Office regarding status of case and motion to compel. (sam)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 Letter to Jacob Nall from Clerk, dated 12/17/19, regarding request for verification of mailing address. (rwc)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to Clerk's Office from Jacob Nall regarding status of case and motion to compel. (sam) (Main Document 7 replaced on 12/17/2019) (sam).
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend Complaint - filed by Jacob Nall. (sam) Modified on 12/17/2019 (nms).
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases - filed by Jacob Nall. (amf)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting D.I. #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Copy mailed to Plaintiff). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/2/2019. (myr)
November 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02187-RGA, 1:19-cv-02189-RGA, 1:19-cv-02190-RGA, 1:19-cv-02191-RGA (rjb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT - filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against James Bounds, Louise (Hillman) Bounds, Sussex Correctional Institution - filed by Jacob Nall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Jacob Nall. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nall v. Sussex Correctional Institution et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sussex Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louise (Hillman) Bounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Bounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne P. Spillane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Delaware (Bail Hearing)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter H. Niebyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Nall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?