Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Bear Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Delmarva Insulation Company and Bear Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02219
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Trial Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Delmarva Insulation Company by Bear Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Doherty, Dawn)
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael I. Silverman on behalf of Delmarva Insulation Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance Certificate of Service)(Silverman, Michael)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION And Order To Extend Time To January 31, 2020 by Bear Industries, Inc..(Doherty, Dawn) Modified on 1/3/2020 (dlw).
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn C. Doherty on behalf of Bear Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Doherty, Dawn)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Bear Industries, Inc. answer due 1/31/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/20/2019. (dlw)
December 12, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael D. O'Donnell for Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael D. O'Donnell filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/11/2019. (dlw)
December 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Delmarva Insulation Company served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Klayman, Barry)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Bear Industries, Inc. served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Klayman, Barry)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael D. O'Donnell - filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Klayman, Barry)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (mal)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Bear Industries, Inc., Delmarva Insulation Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2791924.) - filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)
December 3, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Bear Industries, Inc. and Delmarva Insulation Company on 12/3/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Bear Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delmarva Insulation Company
Represented By: Michael I. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bear Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Dawn C. Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Barry M. Klayman
Represented By: Michael D. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?