Sarro v. Connections Community Support Programs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Sarro
Defendant: Connections Community Support Programs, Inc., James B. Hutchins, Perry Phelps, Marc Richman and Dana Metzger
Case Number: 1:2019cv02232
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #16 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Perry Phelps, James B. Hutchins, Marc Richman, Dana Metzger, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/31/20. (ntl)
January 27, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal and proposed order by James B. Hutchins, Dana Metzger, Perry Phelps, Marc Richman. (Lees, George)
January 9, 2020 Filing 15 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stephen A. Hampton, Esq. regarding Plaintiff's Answering Brief to Defendant Connections Motion to Dismiss - re #5 Opening Brief in Support. (Hampton, Stephen)
January 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Anthony V. Panicola to Withdraw as Attorney - filed by Kelly Sarro. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hampton, Stephen)
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Sarro. Marc Richman served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020. (Hampton, Stephen)
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Sarro. Perry Phelps served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020. (Hampton, Stephen)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Sarro. Dana Metzger served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020. (Hampton, Stephen)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Sarro. James B. Hutchins served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020. (Hampton, Stephen)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Opening Brief in Support, #5 Opening Brief in Support Extension of Time Motion filed by Kelly Sarro. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/23/2019. (etg)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Opening Brief in Support, #5 Opening Brief in Support Extension of Time Motion - filed by Kelly Sarro. (Hampton, Stephen)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 [REDACTED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by James B. Hutchins, Dana Metzger, Perry Phelps, Marc Richman.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through G)(Lees, George) Modified on 12/20/2019 (ntl).
December 19, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to James B. Hutchins on 12/19/2019; Dana Metzger on 12/19/2019; Perry Phelps on 12/19/2019; Marc Richman on 12/19/2019. (kmd)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by James B. Hutchins, Dana Metzger, Perry Phelps, Marc Richman.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through G)(Lees, George)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by James B. Hutchins, Dana Metzger, Perry Phelps, Marc Richman. (Lees, George)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Connections Community Support Programs, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/26/2019. (Rowe, Kelly)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Connections Community Support Programs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rowe, Kelly)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Elizabeth Rowe on behalf of Connections Community Support Programs, Inc. (Rowe, Kelly)
December 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior CT, Case Number N19C-10-006-CEB (Filing fee $400, receipt number DEX032803)- filed by Dana Metzger, Perry Phelps, Marc Richman, James B. Hutchins, Connections Community Support Programs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)
December 6, 2019 No Summons Issued. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarro v. Connections Community Support Programs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connections Community Support Programs, Inc.
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Represented By: Dana Spring Monzo
Represented By: Kelly Elizabeth Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B. Hutchins
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Phelps
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Richman
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Metzger
Represented By: George Thomas Lees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Sarro
Represented By: Timothy G. Willard
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?