In Re: Brookstone Holdings Corp., et al.
Appellee: Michael and Ashley Williams, Ashley C. Williams, Michael S. Williams, U.S. Trustee and Brookstone Holdings Corp.
Appellant: New Brookstone Defendants
Debtor: Brookstone Holdings Corp., et al.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02256
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 15 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Michael and Ashley Williams, Ashley C. Williams, Michael S. Williams re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution . (Leonhardt, Scott)
January 29, 2020 Filing 14 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Michael and Ashley Williams, Ashley C. Williams, Michael S. Williams (Leonhardt, Scott)
January 28, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY BRIEF re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution filed by Michael and Ashley Williams, Ashley C. Williams, Michael S. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit B - Motion to Strike Issue on Appeal, #3 Exhibit C - Docket from Illinois District Court Action, #4 Exhibit D - Bankrupty Court Docket from THG Holdings, #5 Exhibit E - Bankrupty Court Docket from Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc., #6 Exhibit F - Motion for Preliminary Injunction from Coppedge, #7 Exhibit G - Notice of Service)(Leonhardt, Scott)
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution filed by New Brookstone Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D, #5 Ex. E, #6 Ex. F, #7 Ex. G, #8 Ex. H)(Huggett, James)
January 21, 2020 Filing 11 OBJECTIONS by New Brookstone Defendants to #5 Opening Brief in Support, #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution . (Huggett, James)
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of filing the following document(s) in paper format: Transcript of Bankruptcy Court Hearing/Oral Argument on Order of the Bankruptcy Court being Appealed Here. Original document(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by James E. Huggett on behalf of New Brookstone Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Huggett, James)
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appeal by New Brookstone Defendants re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, (Huggett, James)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 DESITNATION OF RECORD AND STATEMENT OF ISSUES on Appeal filed by New Brookstone Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Huggett, James) Modified on 1/15/2020 (dlw).
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Recommendation is ADOPTED and this matter is withdrawn from the mandatory referral for mediation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the appeal briefing is STAYED pending the outcome of #4 Appellees' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/15/2020. (dlw)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/13/20. (cak)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution filed by Michael and Ashley Williams, Ashley C. Williams, Michael S. Williams.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leonhardt, Scott)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution - filed by Michael and Ashley Williams, Ashley C. Williams, Michael S. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leonhardt, Scott)
December 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Wednesday, January 8, 2020, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerks Office of the District Court. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/11/19. (cak)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (sam)
December 11, 2019 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (sam)
December 11, 2019 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED. (sam)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 11/26/2019 by Judge Brendan L. Shannon in Bankruptcy case number 18-11780 BLS. Fee Status Paid.- filed by New Brookstone Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Brookstone Holdings Corp., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael and Ashley Williams
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Scott James Leonhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ashley C. Williams
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Scott James Leonhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael S. Williams
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Scott James Leonhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Daniel N. Brogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Brookstone Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Sean M. Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: New Brookstone Defendants
Represented By: James E. Huggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Brookstone Holdings Corp., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?