Williams v. Sontchi et al
Plaintiff: Calvin D. Williams
Defendant: Christopher S. Sontchi and Samson Resources Corporation, et al.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02306
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend the Complaint - filed by Calvin D. Williams. (nmg)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 Letter to Calvin Williams, dated 1/3/2020, from the Clerk of Court, regarding summons submitted for issuance. (sam) Modified on 1/3/2020 (nms). (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/3/2020) (sam).
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/2/20. (apk)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend the Complaint - filed by Calvin D. Williams. (apk) Modified on 1/3/2020 (nms).
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Calvin D. Williams. (mal)
December 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 19, 2019 No Summons Issued. (kmd)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights filed with Jury Demand against Samson Resources Corporation, et al., Christopher S. Sontchi - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by Calvin D. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(kmd)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Calvin D. Williams. (kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Sontchi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher S. Sontchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samson Resources Corporation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?