LIQWD, INC. et al v. L'OREAL USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Olaplex LLC and Liqwd, Inc.
Defendant: L'OREAL USA PRODUCTS, INC., Redken 5th Avenue NYC, L.L.C., L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc. and L'Oreal USA Inc.
Respondent: Ed Kimble, Alan Gold, Gelest Inc. and Jonathan Goff
Case Number: 1:2019mc00035
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Nature of Suit: Miscellaneous
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM ORDER- granting-in-part #3 Motion to Compel and #2 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/27/2019. (lih)
February 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Oral Argument held on 2/26/2019 re #3 Motion to Compel, #2 Motion to Compel. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
February 22, 2019 Filing 35 REDACTED VERSION of #28 Declaration by L'OREAL USA PRODUCTS, INC., L'Oreal USA Inc., L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc., Redken 5th Avenue NYC, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 2/26/2019 (lih).
February 22, 2019 Filing 34 REDACTED VERSION of #27 Reply to Response to Motion by L'OREAL USA PRODUCTS, INC., L'Oreal USA Inc., L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc., Redken 5th Avenue NYC, L.L.C.. (Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 2/26/2019 (lih).
February 22, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph M. Paunovich and Ali Moghaddas of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP - filed by Liqwd, Inc., Olaplex LLC. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 22, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Naveen Modi, Joseph E. Palys, Katherine F. Murray and Daniel Zeilberger - filed by L'OREAL USA PRODUCTS, INC., L'Oreal USA Inc., L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc., Redken 5th Avenue NYC, L.L.C.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Mowery, Katharine)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aaron E. Moore. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/22/2019. (lih)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Naveen Modi, Joseph E. Palys, Katherine F. Murray and Daniel Zeilberger, #33 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph M. Paunovich and Ali Moghaddas. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/22/2019. (lih)
February 20, 2019 Filing 31 Letter to the Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding Agenda for February 25, 2019 Hearing. (Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 2/21/2019 (lih).
February 19, 2019 Filing 30 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Katharine L. Mowery regarding enclosure of courtesy copies. (Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 2/19/2019 (lih).
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael B. Dubin. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/19/2019. (lih)
February 18, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael B. Dubin - filed by Gelest Inc., Jonathan Goff, Ed Kimble. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel) Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Hanson, Thomas) Modified on 2/19/2019 (lih).
February 15, 2019 Filing 28 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Katherine F. Murray re #27 Reply to Response to Motion by L'OREAL USA PRODUCTS, INC., L'Oreal USA Inc., L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc., Redken 5th Avenue NYC, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 2/19/2019 (lih).
February 15, 2019 Filing 27 [SEALED] REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 Motion to Compel filed by L'OREAL USA PRODUCTS, INC., L'Oreal USA Inc., L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc., Redken 5th Avenue NYC, L.L.C.. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 2/19/2019 (lih).
February 15, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Hanson, Jr on behalf of Gelest Inc., Jonathan Goff, Ed Kimble (Hanson, Thomas)
February 14, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aaron E. Moore - filed by Alan Gold. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification )Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Aranilla, Artemio) Modified on 2/14/2019 (lih).
February 14, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #18 has been modified to link the document to the appropriate filing and accurately reflect the nature of the document. (lih)
February 14, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #16 has been modified to link the document to D.I. #2 . (lih)
February 14, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #13 has been modified to link the document to the appropriate motion. (lih)
February 14, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #19 has been modified to link the document to the appropriate filing and accurately reflect the nature of the document. (lih)
February 14, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #20 has been modified to link the document to D.I. #3 . (lih)
February 14, 2019 Remark: A copy of the NEF setting oral argument regarding the pending motions to compel was delivered via email to the following individuals: Kyle.Gray@saul.com; aemoore@mdwcg.com; gwfox@mdwcg.com; and mdubin@sogtlaw.com. (lih)
February 14, 2019 Remark: Party Gelest Inc., Jonathan Goff, Ed Kimble and Alan Gold added as respondents. (lih)
February 13, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: #3 Motion referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(lih)
February 13, 2019 Remark: A copy of the nef for the oral order dated for today has been emailed to the filer of D.I. #21 at kyle.gray@saul.com. (lih)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the court shall hear argument re #3 MOTION TO COMPEL and #2 MOTION TO COMPEL on 2/25/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel shall collectively have two hours for argument. On or before 2/20/2019, counsel shall submit a joint agenda that outlines the allocation of time and presentation of argument. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: by no later than 2/18/2019, counsel shall submit two courtesy copies of the aforementioned documents and all related filings in accordance with the local rules and administrative procedures of the court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/13/2019. (lih)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #21 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply re #2 MOTION TO COMPEL. Set Briefing Schedule: re #2 MOTION TO COMPEL. (Reply Brief due 2/15/2019.) Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/13/2019. (lih)
February 11, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Motion referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(rjb)
February 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bataillon of the U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska. Please include the initials of the Judge (JFB) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 6, 2019 Filing 24 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/8/2019. (rwc)
February 6, 2019 Filing 23 Record of case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 2:19-mc-00008. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
February 6, 2019 Remark : Miscellaneous Transfer Case Received from USDC/EDPA. Case submitted for routine judicial case assignment. (rwc)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL (ECF DOC.NOS.2,3) AND FILE A REPLY (ECF DOC.NO.21) ARE TRANSFERRED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO BE RENEWED BEFORE THE TRIAL JUDGE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FORTHWITH TRANSFER THIS MISCELLANEOUS ACTION TO THE CLERK OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DOCKETED IN IN 17-CV-14. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE IN THIS DISTRICT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/4/19. 2/4/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Gelest, Inc, Jonathan Goff and Ed Kimble to Comply with Subpoenas filed by L'OREAL USA PRODUCTS, INC., L'OREAL USA S/D, INC., L'OREAL USA, INC..Certificate of Service.(GRAY, KYLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Compel Alan Gold to Comply with Deposition Subpoena filed by L'OREAL USA PRODUCTS, INC., L'OREAL USA S/D, INC., L'OREAL USA, INC., REDKEN 5TH AVENUE NYC, LLC. (GRAY, KYLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Compel THIRD PARTIES GELEST, INC., JONATHAN GOFF AND ED KIMBLE filed by LIQWD, INC., OLAPLEX LLC. (DRAGULESCU, FLORENTINA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Compel THIRD PARTY ALAN GOLD filed by LIQWD, INC., OLAPLEX LLC. (DRAGULESCU, FLORENTINA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE #15 IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANTS MAY FILE A REPLY NOT EXCEEDING THREE PAGES NO LATER THAN 4:00 PM TODAY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/1/19.2/1/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas filed by GELEST, INC., JONATHAN GOFF, ED KIMBLE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DUBIN, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum filed by L'OREAL USA PRODUCTS, INC., L'OREAL USA S/D, INC., L'OREAL USA, INC., REDKEN 5TH AVENUE NYC, LLC..(GRAY, KYLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES' UNCONTESTED LETTER REQUEST IS GRANTED AND GELEST MAY RESPOND TO THE PENDING MOTION TO COMPEL (RE: DOC. NO. #2 ) NO LATER THAN NOON ON 2/1/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/31/2019. 1/31/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena filed by ALAN GOLD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 through 3)(MOORE, AARON) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL B. DUBIN on behalf of GELEST, INC., JONATHAN GOFF, ED KIMBLE with Certificate of Service(DUBIN, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT regarding L'Oreal USA, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Gelest, et al. by L'OREAL USA PRODUCTS, INC., L'OREAL USA S/D, INC., L'OREAL USA, INC., REDKEN 5TH AVENUE NYC, LLC. (GRAY, KYLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including L'Oreal, S.A. and L'Oreal USA, Inc. with Certificate of Service by L'OREAL USA PRODUCTS, INC., L'OREAL USA S/D, INC., L'OREAL USA, INC., REDKEN 5TH AVENUE NYC, LLC.(GRAY, KYLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FORTHWITH LIFT THE SEAL ON THE PENDING MOTIONS TO COMPEL (DOC. NOS. #2 AND #3 ). ANY PARTY OPPOSING THE MOTION TO COMPEL SHALL RESPOND TO THE 1/22/2019 MOTION (DOC. NO. #1 ) NO LATER THAN NOON ON 1/31/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/29/2019. 1/29/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by L'OREAL USA PRODUCTS, INC., L'OREAL USA S/D, INC., L'OREAL USA, INC., REDKEN 5TH AVENUE NYC, LLC regarding the Court's January 24, 2019 Order (GRAY, KYLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by L'OREAL USA PRODUCTS, INC., L'OREAL USA S/D, INC., L'OREAL USA, INC., REDKEN 5TH AVENUE NYC, LLC of the Court's January 24, 2019 Order (GRAY, KYLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON E. MOORE on behalf of ALAN GOLD with Certificate of Service(MOORE, AARON) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY W. FOX on behalf of ALAN GOLD with Certificate of Service(FOX, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SEAL IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF THIS ORDER UPON DEFENDANTS' COUNSEL NO LATER THAN 1/25/2019. DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL (DOC. NOS. #2 AND #3 ) SHALL REMAIN UNDER SEAL UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF COURT, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/24/2019.1/24/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO COMPEL TO COMPLY WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FILED BY L'OREAL USA PRODUCTS, INC., L'OREAL USA S/D, INC., L'OREAL USA, INC., REDKEN 5TH AVENUE NYC, LLC.DECLARATION AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(ahf) (ahf, ). (UNSEALED PER ORDER NO. #9 ) Modified on 1/29/2019 (amas). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION TO COMPEL TO COMPLY WITH SUBPOENAS FILED BY L'OREAL USA PRODUCTS, INC., L'OREAL USA S/D, INC., L'OREAL USA, INC., REDKEN 5TH AVENUE NYC, LLC. DECLARATION AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(ahf) (UNSEALED PER ORDER NO. #9 ) Modified on 1/29/2019 (amas). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION TO SEAL FILED BY L'OREAL USA PRODUCTS, INC., L'OREAL USA S/D, INC., L'OREAL USA, INC., REDKEN 5TH AVENUE NYC, LLC.(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIQWD, INC. et al v. L'OREAL USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'OREAL USA PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Represented By: Katharine Lester Mowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redken 5th Avenue NYC, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Represented By: Katharine Lester Mowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Represented By: Katharine Lester Mowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Represented By: Katharine Lester Mowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olaplex LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Anthony David Raucci
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liqwd, Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Anthony David Raucci
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ed Kimble
Represented By: Thomas E. Hanson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alan Gold
Represented By: Artemio C. Aranilla, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gelest Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E. Hanson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jonathan Goff
Represented By: Thomas E. Hanson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?