IN RE: M/T Nederland Reefer
Petitioner: United States
Material Witness: Roman Aleev, Roman Bakayenko, Filippos Politis, Oleksandr Chernyak and Jacek Kakol
Case Number: 1:2019mc00158
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Stipulation re Testimony by Roman Bakayenko (Rodway, Peter)
August 6, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION Regarding Testimony by Jacek Kakol. (Bostic, Edson)
August 6, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION Regarding Testimony by Filippos Politis. (Bostic, Edson)
August 6, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION Regarding Testimony by Oleksandr Chernyak. (Bostic, Edson)
August 6, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION Regarding Testimony by Roman Aleev. (Bostic, Edson)
August 5, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION Extinguish Conditions of Release filed by Roman Bakayenko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Falgowski, Edmond)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER for Conditions of Release for Material Witnesses Deposed Pursuant to Rule 15. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/5/2019. (crb)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the government shall respond to #23 MOTION to Extinguish Conditions of Release by no later than close of business on 8/5/2019. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/31/2019. (lih)
July 31, 2019 Filing 23 Emergency MOTION to Extinguish Conditions of Release - filed by Roman Bakayenko. (Rodway, Peter) Modified on 7/31/2019 (lih).
July 29, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Rule 15 Depositions by United States (Kehoe, David)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #21 MOTION and Order for Conditions of Release for Material Witness. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/10/2019. (lih)
July 10, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION and Order for Conditions of Release for Material Witness - filed by United States. (lih)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Jacek Kakol. Appointment of Edson A. Bostic, Esq., for Jacek Kakol. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/10/2019. (lih)
July 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Initial Appearance held on 7/10/2019. ( Material Witness -Jacek Kakol) held on 7/10/2019 as to Jacek Kakol; Witness was present with counsel ( Eleni Kousoulis, Esq. of FPD's office appointed); Polish Interpreter Peter Zabiegala sworn ; Deft. ordered released on his Own Recognizance with special conditions; Govt. will filed an all inclusive Motion and Order of Release Conditions for the witnesses; Govt's motion; GRANTED. (APPEARANCES: Govt- C. Hudson, Esq.; DEFT- E. Kousoulis, Esq.; PROB- V. Hislop). (lih)
July 9, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted D.I. 20 and uploaded the revised version of the document to D.I. #18 . (lih)
July 9, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Kehoe on behalf of United States (Kehoe, David)
July 9, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #18 has been modified to accurately reflect the nature of the filing. Counsel is advised to use the STATUS REPORT event code when filing a document of this nature in the future. (lih)
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 Joint Status Report by United States (Kehoe, David) Modified on 7/9/2019 (lih). (Main Document 18 replaced on 7/9/2019) (lih).
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jacek Kakol. (lih)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER RESCHEDULING INITIAL APPEARANCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the initial appearance previously set in this matter for 7/2/2019 as to Jacek Kakol is RESCHEDULED to 7/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/3/2019. (lih)
June 28, 2019 Summons Issued as to Jacek Kakol for Initial Appearance set for 7/2/2019 at 11:00 AM. (lih)
June 28, 2019 Set Hearings: An Initial Appearance for Material Witness Jacek Kakol is set for 7/2/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (lih)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of CGIS Special Agent Brian McKnight re #15 MOTION AND ORDER To Issue Material Witness Summons filed by United States. (lih)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #15 MOTION AND ORDER To Issue Material Witness Summons filed by United States. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/28/2019. (lih)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION AND ORDER To Issue Material Witness Summons - filed by United States. (lih)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- denying without prejudice on the basis that the same motion seeking the same relief is pending before the District Judge in the related criminal action 19-cr-58 RGA, [D.I. 64] re #5 MOTION to Take Deposition of Roman Bakayenko filed by Roman Bakayenko. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/28/2019. (lih)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Roman Aleev. (kjk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Oleksandr Chernyak. (kjk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Roman Bakayenko. (kjk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Filippos Politis. (kjk)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER- granting #6 MOTION and Order for Conditions of Release. Status Report due by 7/8/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Government shall provide to the material witnesses supplemental documentation for the extension of immigration parole. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/20/2019. (lih)
June 20, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Initial Appearance held on 6/20/2019. ( Material Witness -Roman Bakayenko ) held on 6/20/2019 as to Roman Bakayenko ; Witness was present with retained counsel ( Peter Rodway, Esq.); Ukranian Interpreter Alex Tarasov sworn ; Deft. ordered released on his Own Recognizance with special conditions; Govt. will filed an all inclusive Motion and Order of Release Conditions for the witnesses; Govt's motion; GRANTED. (APPEARANCES: Govt- E. Falgowski, Esq.; DEFT- P. Rodway, Esq.; PROB- V. Hislop). (lih)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Roman Aleev. Appointment of Edson A. Bostic, Esq., for Roman Aleev. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/20/2019. (lih)
June 20, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Initial Appearance held on 6/20/2019. ( Material Witness -Roman Aleev) held on 6/20/2019 as to Roman Aleev; Witness was present with counsel ( Eleni Kousoulis, Esq. of FPD's office appointed); Russian Interpreter Isabelle Avrutin sworn ; Deft. ordered released on his Own Recognizance with special conditions; Govt. will filed an all inclusive Motion and Order of Release Conditions for the witnesses; Govt's motion; GRANTED. (APPEARANCES: Govt- E. Falgowski, Esq.; DEFT- E. Kousoulis, Esq.; PROB- V. Hislop). (lih)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Oleksandr Chernyak. Appointment of Edson A. Bostic, Esq., for Oleksandr Chernyak. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/20/2019. (lih)
June 20, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Initial Appearance held on 6/20/2019. ( Material Witness -Oleksandr Chernyak) held on 6/20/2019 as to Oleksandr Chernyak; Witness was present with counsel ( Eleni Kousoulis, Esq. of FPD's office appointed); Russina Interpreter Isabelle Avrutin sworn ; Deft. ordered released on his Own Recognizance with special conditions; Govt. will filed an all inclusive Motion and Order of Release Conditions for the witnesses; Govt's motion; GRANTED. (APPEARANCES: Govt- E. Falgowski, Esq.; DEFT- E. Kousoulis, Esq.; PROB- V. Hislop). (lih) (lih)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Filippos Politis. Appointment of Edson A. Bostic, Esq., for Filippos Politis. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/20/2019. (lih)
June 20, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Initial Appearance held on 6/20/2019. ( Material Witness -Filippos Politis) held on 6/20/2019 as to Filippos Politis; Witness was present with counsel ( Eleni Kousoulis, Esq. of FPD's office appointed); Greek Interpreter Maria Spanos sworn ; Deft. ordered released on his Own Recognizance with special conditions; Govt. will filed an all inclusive Motion and Order of Release Conditions for the witnesses; Govt's motion; GRANTED. (APPEARANCES: Govt- E. Falgowski, Esq.; DEFT- E. Kousoulis, Esq.; PROB- V. Hislop). (lih)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION and Order for Conditions of Release for Material Witnesses - filed by United States. (Falgowski, Edmond) Modified on 6/20/2019 (lih).
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Take Deposition of Roman Bakayenko - filed by Roman Bakayenko. (Rodway, Peter)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter E. Rodway on behalf of Roman Bakayenko (Rodway, Peter)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter E. Rodway on behalf of Roman Bakayenko (Rodway, Peter)
June 14, 2019 Summons Issued as to Roman Aleev, Roman Bakayenko, Oleksandr Chernyak, Filippos Politis for Initial Appearance scheduled for 6/20/19 at 1:00 pm. (kjk)
June 13, 2019 Set Hearings: A Initial Appearance for the Material Witnesses is set for 6/20/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (kjk)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motion and Order to Issue Material Witness Summons by CGIS Special Agent Brian McKnight. (kjk)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED Granting #1 MOTION AND ORDER To Issue Material Witness Summons. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/13/19. (kjk)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION AND ORDER To Issue Material Witness Summons - filed by United States. (kjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: M/T Nederland Reefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Material witness: Roman Aleev
Represented By: Edson A. Bostic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Material witness: Roman Bakayenko
Represented By: Edson A. Bostic
Represented By: Peter E. Rodway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Material witness: Filippos Politis
Represented By: Edson A. Bostic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Material witness: Oleksandr Chernyak
Represented By: Edson A. Bostic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Material witness: Jacek Kakol
Represented By: Edson A. Bostic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States
Represented By: Edmond Falgowski
Represented By: David P. Kehoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?