Rome Enterprises, Inc. et al v. ReBath, LLC
Petitioner: Koehler Partners, Inc., Koehler Family Enterprises, Inc., Port City Baths, Inc., HD Solutions, LLC and Rome Enterprises, Inc.
Respondent: ReBath, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019mc00191
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF re #9 MOTION to Vacate / Rebath, LLCs Combined Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award and Response to Petitioners Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award, #2 MOTION (Petitioners' Reply Brief Supporting Their Motion to Confirm Final Award of Arbitrator and Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award) filed by HD Solutions, LLC, Koehler Family Enterprises, Inc., Koehler Partners, Inc., Port City Baths, Inc., Rome Enterprises, Inc.. (Renck, Richard)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey H. Wolf, Lauren Elliot Stine, and Kristen M. Arredondo filed by ReBath, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/25/2019. (fms)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey H. Wolf, Lauren Elliot Stine, and Kristen M. Arredondo - filed by ReBath, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jeffrey H. Wolf, #2 Certification of Lauren Elliot Stine, #3 Certification of Kristen M. Arredondo)(Powers, Elizabeth)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION re #9 MOTION to Vacate / Rebath, LLCs Combined Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award and Response to Petitioners Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award by ReBath, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24)(Powers, Elizabeth)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION re #9 MOTION to Vacate / Rebath, LLCs Combined Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award and Response to Petitioners Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award / Declaration of Brad Hillier by ReBath, LLC. (Powers, Elizabeth)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #9 MOTION to Vacate / Rebath, LLCs Combined Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award and Response to Petitioners Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by ReBath, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/27/2019. (Powers, Elizabeth)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Vacate / Rebath, LLCs Combined Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award and Response to Petitioners Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award - filed by ReBath, LLC. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Powers, Elizabeth)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 Third STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Respondent ReBath, LLC to Respond to the Petition to Confirm Final Award of Arbitrator to September 13, 2019 filed by ReBath, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/6/2019. (fms)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 Third STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Respondent ReBath, LLC to Respond to the Petition to Confirm Final Award of Arbitrator to September 13, 2019 - filed by ReBath, LLC. (Jowers, Jason)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Respondent ReBath, LLC to Respond to the Petition to Confirm Final Award of Arbitrator to September 6, 2019 filed by ReBath, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/3/2019. (fms)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Respondent ReBath, LLC to Respond to the Petition to Confirm Final Award of Arbitrator to September 6, 2019 - filed by ReBath, LLC. (Jowers, Jason)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Respondent ReBath, LLC to Respond to the Petition to Confirm Final Award of Arbitrator to August 30, 2019 filed by ReBath, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/19/2019. (nmf)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Respondent ReBath, LLC to Respond to the Petition to Confirm Final Award of Arbitrator to August 30, 2019 - filed by ReBath, LLC. (Powers, Elizabeth)
August 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Koehler Family Enterprises, Inc., Koehler Partners, Inc., HD Solutions, LLC, Rome Enterprises, Inc., Port City Baths, Inc.. (Renck, Richard)
August 2, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to ReBath, LLC. (myr)
July 30, 2019 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial case assignment (kmd)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of J. Manly Parks in support of D.I. #1 Petition and #2 Motion by HD Solutions, LLC, Koehler Family Enterprises, Inc., Koehler Partners, Inc., Port City Baths, Inc., Rome Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(kmd) Modified on 7/31/2019 (kmd).
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Memorandum of Law in Support re D.I. #2 MOTION filed by HD Solutions, LLC, Koehler Family Enterprises, Inc., Koehler Partners, Inc., Port City Baths, Inc., Rome Enterprises, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/13/2019. (kmd)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Confirm Final Award of Arbitration - filed by HD Solutions, LLC, Koehler Family Enterprises, Inc., Koehler Partners, Inc., Port City Baths, Inc., Rome Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(kmd)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 Petition to Confirm Final Arbitration Award - filed by HD Solutions, LLC, Koehler Family Enterprises, Inc., Koehler Partners, Inc., Port City Baths, Inc., Rome Enterprises, Inc. (Filing Fee $47, receipt number 0311-2697574.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rome Enterprises, Inc. et al v. ReBath, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ReBath, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Powers
Represented By: Jason Carden Jowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Koehler Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Renck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Koehler Family Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Renck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Port City Baths, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Renck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HD Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Richard L. Renck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rome Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Renck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?