Thompson v. Tiffany & Co. et al
Plaintiff: John Thompson
Defendant: Rose Marie Bravo, Roger N. Farah, James E. Lillie, Jane Hertzmark Hudis, Abby F. Kohnstamm, Tiffany & Co., Hafize Gaye Erkan, Alessandro Bogliolo, Robert S. Singer, William A. Shutzer and Annie Young-Scrivner
Case Number: 1:2020cv00009
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #14 . (nms)
February 12, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Thompson (Long, Brian)
January 9, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by John Thompson: For Tiffany & Co. waiver sent on 1/8/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Long, Brian)
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by John Thompson: For William A. Shutzer waiver sent on 1/8/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Long, Brian)
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by John Thompson: For Annie Young-Scrivner waiver sent on 1/8/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Long, Brian)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by John Thompson: For Robert S. Singer waiver sent on 1/8/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Long, Brian)
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by John Thompson: For Jane Hertzmark Hudis waiver sent on 1/8/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Long, Brian)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by John Thompson: For James E. Lillie waiver sent on 1/8/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Long, Brian)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by John Thompson: For Abby F. Kohnstamm waiver sent on 1/8/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Long, Brian)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by John Thompson: For Hafize Gaye Erkan waiver sent on 1/8/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Long, Brian)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by John Thompson: For Rose Marie Bravo waiver sent on 1/8/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Long, Brian)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by John Thompson: For Roger N. Farah waiver sent on 1/8/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Long, Brian)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by John Thompson: For Alessandro Bogliolo waiver sent on 1/8/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Long, Brian)
January 8, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 3, 2020 No Summons Issued. (myr)
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934 filed with Jury Demand against Alessandro Bogliolo, Rose Marie Bravo, Hafize Gaye Erkan, Roger N. Farah, Jane Hertzmark Hudis, Abby F. Kohnstamm, James E. Lillie, William A. Shutzer, Robert S. Singer, Tiffany & Co., Annie Young-Scrivner - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2815464.) - filed by John Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Tiffany & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Marie Bravo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger N. Farah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Lillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Hertzmark Hudis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abby F. Kohnstamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hafize Gaye Erkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessandro Bogliolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A. Shutzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie Young-Scrivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Thompson
Represented By: Brian D. Long
Represented By: Gina M. Serra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?