Sabatini v. Ribbon Communications Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eric Sabatini
Defendant: Scott E. Schubert, Kim S. Fennebresque, Richard J. Lynch, Bruns H. Grayson, Kent J. Mathy, Rick W. Smith, Beatriz V. Infante and Ribbon Communications Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00069
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #4 . (dlw)
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eric Sabatini (Serra, Gina)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action served on Ribbon Communications Inc., Kim S. Fennebresque, Bruns H. Grayson, Beatriz V. Infante, Richard J. Lynch, Kent J. Mathy, Scott E. Schubert, and Rick W. Smith on 1/24/2020, filed by Eric Sabatini. (Serra, Gina)
January 24, 2020 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Kim S. Fennebresque on 1/24/2020; Bruns H. Grayson on 1/24/2020; Beatriz V. Infante on 1/24/2020; Richard J. Lynch on 1/24/2020; Kent J. Mathy on 1/24/2020; Ribbon Communications Inc. on 1/24/2020; Scott E. Schubert on 1/24/2020; Rick W. Smith on 1/24/2020. (apk)
January 22, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 17, 2020 No Summons Issued. (mal)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Kim S. Fennebresque, Bruns H. Grayson, Beatriz V. Infante, Richard J. Lynch, Kent J. Mathy, Ribbon Communications Inc., Scott E. Schubert, Rick W. Smith - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2827591.) - filed by Eric Sabatini. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabatini v. Ribbon Communications Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Sabatini
Represented By: Gina M. Serra
Represented By: Brian D. Long
Represented By: Seth D. Rigrodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott E. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim S. Fennebresque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruns H. Grayson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent J. Mathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beatriz V. Infante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ribbon Communications Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?