Guinn v. St. Jude Medical, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Camren Guinn
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc. and St. Jude Medical, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00071
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Referring Judge: Christopher J Burke
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION re #17 MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint, by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Judicial Notice)(Rostocki, Brian) Modified on 3/12/2020 (nms).
March 11, 2020 Filing 18 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #17 MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/25/2020. (Rostocki, Brian) Modified on 3/12/2020 (nms).
March 11, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint - filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Rostocki, Brian) Modified on 3/12/2020 (nms).
March 11, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION re #14 MOTION to Dismiss, by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Judicial Notice)(Rostocki, Brian) Modified on 3/12/2020 (nms).
March 11, 2020 Filing 15 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/25/2020. (Rostocki, Brian) Modified on 3/12/2020 (nms).
March 11, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Rostocki, Brian) Modified on 3/12/2020 (nms).
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORAL ORDER: The case is now referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke for all purposes through the case dispositive motion deadline. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/4/2020. (nms)
March 2, 2020 Filing 12 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint, by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC. (Rostocki, Brian)
March 2, 2020 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #2 . (nms)
February 21, 2020 Remark: The Complaint at D.I. #2 has been placed under seal per D.I. #11 . (nms)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #9 MOTION to Seal Limited Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/18/2020. (nms) Modified on 2/21/2020 (nms).
February 18, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION re #9 MOTION to Seal Limited Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rostocki, Brian)
February 18, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: The declaration and its exhibits filed as attachments to the motion at D.I. #9 have been removed from that filing. Motions and declarations are to be filed independent of each other. Counsel shall refile the declaration accordingly. (nms)
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Seal Limited Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint - filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC. (Attachments:(5) Text of Proposed Order)(Rostocki, Brian) Modified on 2/18/2020 (nms).
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint to March 11, 2020 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Abbott Laboratories, Inc. answer due 3/11/2020; St. Jude Medical, LLC answer due 3/11/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/11/2020. (nms)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to respond to the Complaint to March 11, 2020 - filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC. (Rostocki, Brian)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Camren Guinn. Abbott Laboratories, Inc. served on 1/20/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. (Culley, David)
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Camren Guinn. St. Jude Medical, LLC served on 1/20/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. (Culley, David)
January 31, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 6 and D.I. 7 have been removed from the docket as the filing were made using the incorrect filing code. Counsel is to refile the summons returned executed using the "Summons Returned Executed" filing code which will allow answer due dates to be set. (nms)
January 31, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 22, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from David G. Culley, Esquire regarding Denial of Plaintiff's Motion to File Complaint Under Seal. (Culley, David)
January 17, 2020 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (kmd)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 MOTION to Seal filed by Camren Guinn - DENIED. Plaintiff alleges information that is in the public domain (or otherwise Plaintiff would not have it). Thus, there is no reason to seal the Complaint. (Complaint will be unsealed.) Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/17/2020. (kmd)
January 17, 2020 Remark: Exit copies of documents to duty judge. (kmd)
January 17, 2020 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Abbott Laboratories, Inc. on 1/17/2020; St. Jude Medical, LLC on 1/17/2020. (kmd)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 SEALED COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Abbott Laboratories, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number DEX033189.) - filed by Camren Guinn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) Modified on 1/17/2020 (kmd). Modified on 2/21/2020 (nms). Modified on 2/21/2020 (nms).
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal - filed by Camren Guinn. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guinn v. St. Jude Medical, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Jude Medical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camren Guinn
Represented By: David G. Culley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?