Winter v. Doe
Plaintiff: Hermione Kelly Ivy Winter
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2020cv00134
Filed: January 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 14 Letter to Hermione Kelly Ivy Winter from Clerk of the Court regarding status of cases - re (74 in 1:17-cv-01322-LPS, 28 in 1:17-cv-01292-LPS, 10 in 1:20-cv-00134-LPS, 21 in 1:18-cv-00351-LPS, 65 in 1:17-cv-01432-LPS) Letter. (kmd)
March 25, 2020 Filing 13 Letter to Hermione Kelly Ivy Winter from Clerk of the Court enclosing Authorization Form - re #8 Letter. (kmd)
March 16, 2020 Filing 11 Emergency MOTION for Leave to Amend and any Preliminary Injunction Offered at This Stage - filed by Hermione Kelly Ivy Winter. (kmd)
March 12, 2020 Filing 10 Letter to Clerk of the Court from Hermione Kelly Ivy Winter requesting case status and history. (kmd)
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Stay or Consolidation - filed by Hermione Kelly Ivy Winter. (kmd)
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 Letter to Clerk of the Court from Hermione Kelly Ivy Winter requesting copy of Authorization Form (D.I. #6 ) and request to amend complaint. (kmd)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 EXHIBIT (Part 1 of 16) re #1 Complaint - filed by Hermione Kelly Ivy Winter. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 16, #2 Part 3 of 16, #3 Part 4 of 16, #4 Part 5 of 16, #5 Part 6 of 16, #6 Part 7 of 16, #7 Part 8 of 16, #8 Part 9 of 16, #9 Part 10 of 16, #10 Part 11 of 16, #11 Part 12 of 16, #12 Part 13 of 16, #13 Part 14 of 16, #14 Part 15 of 16, #15 Part 16 of 16)(kmd)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Motion to Proceed IFP. Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. An initial partial filing fee of $8.84 shall be required. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form)(Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/23/2020.). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Authorization) (kmd)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 Trust Fund Account Statement - filed by Hermione Kelly Ivy Winter. (amf)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Hermione Kelly Ivy Winter. (amf)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - The Plaintiff shall be assessed the filing fee of $350.00. Plaintiff shall submit IFP application (short form) and Trust Fund Account Statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form) Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/9/2020. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 02/07/2020. (mal)
February 5, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 29, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
January 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against John Doe - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (No Filing Fee Paid/No IFP) - filed by Hermione Kelly Ivy Winter.(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winter v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hermione Kelly Ivy Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?