In re: New Century TRS Holdings, Inc. et al.
Debtor: New Century TRS Holdings, Inc., et al.
Appellant: Candence B. Lynch and Michael D. Lynch
Appellee: New Century TRS Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00182
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION for D.I. #8 Recommendation that BK Appeal be Withdrawn from Mediation. This matter is withdrawn from the mandatory referral for mediation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before May 4, 2020, the parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule for this appeal. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/3/2020. (amf)
March 16, 2020 Filing 8 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/16/20. (cak)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: The teleconference scheduled for 2/24/20 at 11:00 a.m. Eastern Time with Judge Thynge has been rescheduled to 3/5/2020 at 11:00 AM Eastern Time. Counsel for appellee shall initiate the teleconference call. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/20/20. ***A copy of this Oral Order has been mailed to pro se appellants to their address of record on 2/20/20.*** (cak).
February 18, 2020 Filing 6 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Pursuant to this Courts Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court under to 28 U.S.C. 158; IT IS ORDERED that a teleconference has been scheduled for Monday, February 24, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Eastern Time with Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge related to the screening process for mediation. Counsel for appellee shall initiate the teleconference call. Local counsel are reminded of their obligations to inform out-of-state counsel of this Order. To avoid the imposition of sanctions, counsel shall advise the Court immediately of any problems regarding compliance with this Order. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/18/20. ***A copy of this Oral Order has been mailed to Appellants to their address of record on 2/18/20.*** (cak)
February 18, 2020 Remark - On 2/18/2020, Pro Se Appellant Michael Lynch called to inform Chambers that he has paid the filing fee. Court staff checked the Bankruptcy Court docket and confirmed that the fee has indeed been paid. (dlw)
February 13, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Mark S. Indelicato and Jeffrey Zawadzki for New Century TRS Holdings, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark S. Indelicato, #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey Zawadzki filed by New Century TRS Holdings, Inc., New Century TRS Holdings, Inc., et al. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/13/2020. (dlw)
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey Zawadzki - filed by New Century TRS Holdings, Inc., New Century TRS Holdings, Inc., et al.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guilfoyle, Victoria)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark S. Indelicato - filed by New Century TRS Holdings, Inc., New Century TRS Holdings, Inc., et al.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guilfoyle, Victoria)
February 13, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 3 has been replaced on the docket and the docket text amended to reflect that APPELLANTS are responsible for paying the filing fee. (dlw)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, Appellants will pay the $298 filing fee, payable to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware or submit a complete application to proceed without prepayment of fees (AO Form 239, copy attached) to the United States District Court (Office of Clerk, U.S. District Court) Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 02/13/2020. (apk) Modified on 2/13/2020 (dlw). (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/13/2020) (dlw).
February 12, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (lak)
February 6, 2020 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (lak)
February 6, 2020 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (lak)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 1/22/2020 by The Honorable Brendan Linehan Shannon in Bankruptcy case number 7-10416 (BLS). Fee Status not paid.- filed by Michael D. Lynch, Candence B. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: New Century TRS Holdings, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: New Century TRS Holdings, Inc., et al.
Represented By: Victoria Anne Guilfoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Candence B. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Michael D. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: New Century TRS Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald S. Gellert
Represented By: David W. Carickhoff, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Sloan
Represented By: Bryan James Hall
Represented By: Jeffrey Zawadzki
Represented By: Victoria Anne Guilfoyle
Represented By: Mark S. Indelicato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?